Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Marcia Morales Howard
Referred: Monte C Richardson
Case #: 3:23-cv-01073
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Jan 10, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 7:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Brixmor Cobblestone Village Parcel LLC
Represented By
Beth S. Joseph
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brixmor GA Cobblestone Village at St. Augustine, LLC
Represented By
Beth S. Joseph
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carol Gaylor
Represented By
Brian T. Ku
Ku & Mussman, PA
contact info
Louis I. Mussman
Ku & Mussman, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 18, 2024
25 25 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 04/18 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELM)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 04/18 11:07 AM
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/18/2024. (JW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/17 10:58 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Carol Gaylor. (Mussman, Louis) Modified on 4/17/2024 to edit text (ELM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 04/10 11:49 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 21 Second Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline to File a Stipulation of Dismissal. The parties shall have until April 22, 2024 to file a joint stipulation of dismissal or other appropriate documents to close out this file. The proposed order attached to the Motion is STRICKEN pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(j). Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/10/2024. (ADM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 04/09 2:15 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Carol Gaylor.(Mussman, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 07, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 03/07 3:32 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline to File a Stipulation of Dismissal. The parties shall have until April 10, 2024 to file a joint stipulation of dismissal or other appropriate documents to close out this file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/7/2024. (ADM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 03/06 3:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Carol Gaylor.(Mussman, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Administratively Closing Case Wed 01/10 11:12 AM
ORDER directing administrative closure of case. The parties shall have until March 11, 2024, to file a joint stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 1/10/2024. (JW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of settlement Tue 01/09 12:47 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Carol Gaylor (Mussman, Louis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 11/08 1:45 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Inspect Defendant's Property to the extent the ADA Scheduling Order is amended as follows: Defendant shall permit Plaintiff's counsel and expert reasonable access to inspect Defendant's facility on or before January 12, 2024; and Plaintiff shall have until January 16, 2024 to provide Defendant with a copy of any expert report upon which Plaintiff intends to rely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/8/2023. (ADM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 11/07 4:55 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - To Inspect Defendant's Property by Carol Gaylor.(Mussman, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, October 30, 2023
14 14 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Mon 10/30 2:04 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories by Carol Gaylor. (Mussman, Louis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/12 3:57 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Carol Gaylor. (Mussman, Louis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/11 3:48 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Brixmor Cobblestone Village Parcel LLC, Brixmor GA Cobblestone Village at St. Augustine, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Brixmor Property Group, Inc. for Brixmor Cobblestone Village Parcel LLC, Brixmor GA Cobblestone Village at St. Augustine, LLC.. (Joseph, Beth)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order to Strike Wed 10/11 12:12 PM
ORDER to strike re: 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Brixmor Cobblestone Village Parcel LLC, Brixmor GA Cobblestone Village at St. Augustine, LLC. On or before October 18, 2023, Defendants shall file a proper disclosure statement on the form provided by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/11/2023. (ADM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 10/10 4:37 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Brixmor Cobblestone Village Parcel LLC, Brixmor GA Cobblestone Village at St. Augustine, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Brixmor Property Group, Inc. for Brixmor Cobblestone Village Parcel LLC, Brixmor GA Cobblestone Village at St. Augustine, LLC.. (Joseph, Beth)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 10/10 11:50 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants' answer or response to the Complaint is due November 1, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/10/2023. (ADM)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Mon 10/09 3:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Brixmor Cobblestone Village Parcel LLC, Brixmor GA Cobblestone Village at St. Augustine, LLC. (Joseph, Beth)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 10/09 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Beth S. Joseph on behalf of Brixmor Cobblestone Village Parcel LLC, Brixmor GA Cobblestone Village at St. Augustine, LLC. Lead Counsel: Beth S. Joseph. (Joseph, Beth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
6 6 service Summons returned executed Tue 09/26 3:38 PM
RETURN of service executed on 9/20/23 by Carol Gaylor as to Brixmor GA Cobblestone Village at St. Augustine, LLC. (Mussman, Louis)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons returned executed Tue 09/26 3:36 PM
RETURN of service executed on 9/20/23 by Carol Gaylor as to Brixmor Cobblestone Village Parcel LLC. (Mussman, Louis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
4 4 service Summons issued Thu 09/14 4:00 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Brixmor Cobblestone Village Parcel LLC, Brixmor GA Cobblestone Village at St. Augustine, LLC. (JDR)
Related: [-]
3 3 8 pgs order Order Thu 09/14 9:24 AM
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/14/2023. (JW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/13 8:59 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:23-cv-1073-MMH-MCR. (ABC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/12 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Brixmor Cobblestone Village Parcel LLC, Brixmor GA Cobblestone Village at St. Augustine, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21243288) filed by Carol Gaylor.(Mussman, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons