California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 3:23-cv-04681
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Oct 25, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:09 AM PDT
Defendant
SanDisk, LLC
Represented By
Joseph Louis Kish
Segal Mccambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Western Digital Corporation
Represented By
Joseph Louis Kish
Segal Mccambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Western Digital Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Louis Kish
Segal Mccambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathan Jackson
Represented By
Stephen R. Basser
Barrack, Rodos & Bacine
contact info
Samuel M. Ward
Barrack Rodos & Bacine
contact info
John G. Emerson
Emerson Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, December 15, 2023
20 20 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12/15 4:14 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Rita F. Lin. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 10/25 2:32 PM
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 20 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases. (vclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
18 18 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Tue 10/10 3:51 PM
RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases by SanDisk, LLC, Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies, Inc.. (Kish, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 10/03 10:44 AM
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 16 Stipulation. (vclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
16 16 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 10/02 1:14 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Enlargement of Time for Defendants to Answer to Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SanDisk, LLC, Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies, Inc. and Nathan Jackson.(Kish, Joseph) Modified on 10/2/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 09/26 12:02 PM
REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2023 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, November 9, 2023, by no later than 12:00PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 09/25 12:43 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Mon 09/25 11:55 AM
ORDER RELATING CASES: 3:23-cv-04152-VC & 5:23-cv-04681-SVK. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/19/2023. (bxs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/12 2:58 PM
Proposed Summons. (Basser, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/12 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18636432.). Filed byNathan Jackson.(Basser, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet