California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Referred: Pslc Sjt
Case #: 3:23-cv-04669
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Dec 14, 2023
Petitioner
Gerrod Herndon
Respondent
Novato P. D.
Respondent
San Rafael P. D.

GPO Dec 14 2023
resses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 12/14/2023 (rfm, COURT USER).ORDER OF DISMISSAL;DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 12/13/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 12/14/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the add

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, December 14, 2023
8 8 order Judgment Thu 12/14 12:57 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 12/13/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 12/14 12:56 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL;DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 12/13/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 12/14/2023 (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
utility Remark Fri 09/29 3:38 PM
Mailed to petitioner at 910 D Street in San Rafael a list of 37 PSP cases, dating back to 2011, that our records show as having been filed by Gerrod Herndon; enclosed docket sheets for the pending cases, 23-4669 TLT and 23-4212 CRB. (ljf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
6 6 misc Letter Wed 09/27 1:39 PM
Letter from Gerrod Herndon. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
5 5 misc Letter Mon 09/25 9:36 AM
Letter to Petitioner requesting payment of fee to conduct records search re4 Received Document. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Received Document Mon 09/25 9:29 AM
Received Document by Gerrod Herndon. Request for case information. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
3 3 misc Prison Trust Fund Account Statement Wed 09/20 3:28 PM
Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Gerrod Herndon. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
2 2 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Tue 09/12 2:15 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/20/2023. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 09/12 2:12 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byGerrod Herndon.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope