Nebraska District Court
Judge:Brian C Buescher
Referred: Ryan C Carson
Case #: 8:23-cv-00404
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Case in other court:Douglas County, Nebraska District Court, CI-23-05723
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 6:12 AM CDT
Defendant
Safeco Insurance Company
Represented By
Bruce A. Moothart
Seyferth, Blumenthal Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Millard Gutter Company
Represented By
Dru Moses
Sodoro Law Firm
contact info
Philip O. Cusic
Sodoro Law Firm
contact info
Anne M. Marcotte
Sodoro Law Firm
contact info
Jeffrey A. Nix
Sodoro Law Firm
contact info

GPO Apr 16 2025
ORDER - Defendant's Notice of Fees and Expenses is approved. (Filing No. 65). Upon information from Defendant, Plaintiff has provided Safeco's counsel with a check in the amount of $3,842.86, satisfying the award of fees and expenses authorized in Filing No. 56. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (MKR)
GPO May 09 2025
CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (MKR)

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
72 72 order Protective Order Fri 05/09 4:00 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (MKR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
71 71 audio Audio File - Restricted Fri 05/02 2:55 PM
RESTRICTED AUDIO FILE (6.8 MB) regarding Telephone Conference 69 held on 5/2/2025 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). (KLF)
Related: [-]
70 70 order Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act Fri 05/02 2:52 PM
RESTRICTED DISCOVERY DISPUTE EVIDENCE. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (KLF)
Related: [-]
69 69 minutes Telephone Conference Fri 05/02 2:42 PM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. A telephone conference was held on May 2, 2025, regarding a discovery dispute. Theodore R. Boecker, Jr. appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Bruce A. Moothart appeared on behalf of the Defendant. The parties shall govern themselves in accordance with the conversation during the conference. Separate audio file will be uploaded. The parties shall confer and submit a proposed protective order by email to the court (carson@ned.uscourts.gov) no later than May 9, 2025. Parties shall confer further regarding Defendants Request for Production of Documents Nos. 19 and 23. If they reach an agreement, Plaintiff shall provide to Defendant unredacted disclosures pursuant to that discovery no later than May 9, 2025. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement, they may notify the court on or before May 9, 2025, that their discovery dispute is not resolved and request further action by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. Time Start: 11:00 a.m.; Time Stop: 11:30 a.m.; Time in Court: 30 Minutes. (CEW)
Related: [-]