California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:23-cv-04667
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Aug 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:09 AM PDT
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
USCIS
Ur Jaddou, USCIS 5900 Capital Gateway Drive Mail Stop 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos Ordonez Cruz
Represented By
Jessica T. Arena
Law Office Of Jessica T. Arena
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, August 19, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 08/19 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Carlos Ordonez Cruz (Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/20 6:58 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; ORDER re 17 , Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/20/2024. Joint Status Report or Order for Dismissal due by 8/26/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
17 17 misc Status Report Tue 06/18 12:41 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Stipulation to Continue the Stay of Proceedings; [Proposed] Order by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, USCIS. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 05/17 10:25 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; ORDER re 15 Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/17/2024. Joint Status Report or Order for Dismissal due by 6/17/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
15 15 misc Status Report Thu 05/16 11:48 AM
Joint Status Report and Stipulation to Continue the Stay of Proceedings; [Proposed] Order by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, USCIS. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 12/01 12:46 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 13 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. Order for Dismissal or Joint Status Report due by 5/16/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 12/01 9:28 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Stay Proceedings; [Proposed] Order filed by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, USCIS. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 11/20 3:54 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 9 Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/20 8:53 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, USCIS.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 11/20 7:21 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 11/27/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
9 9 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 11/17 1:25 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response and [Proposed] Order filed by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, USCIS. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/17 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 09/18 12:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Ordonez Cruz. All Defendants. (Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 09/14 2:57 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carlos Ordonez Cruz.. (Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Thu 09/14 7:10 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 09/14 7:07 AM
Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, USCIS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/12 2:59 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/12 11:27 AM
Proposed Summons. (Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/12 11:25 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18634895.). Filed byCarlos Ordonez Cruz.(Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - I-589 Receipt Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - In-Person Reschedule Request,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet