California Northern District Court
Judge:Richard Seeborg
Case #: 4:23-cv-04671
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Feb 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:09 AM PDT
Defendant
Judge Victoria George
Defendant
Jason Louie
Defendant
James Williams, Jr.
Defendant
Laverne Williams
Defendant
Parrig Williams
Plaintiff
Robert O. Johnson
410 Station Park Circle
San Mateo, CA 94402
Plaintiff
Jamari Johnson
410 Station Park Circle
San Mateo, CA 94402


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
11 11 motion Report and Recommendations Order Reassigning Case Tue 12/19 1:33 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS CASE re 1 , Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/19/2023. Objections due by 1/2/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
10 10 misc Mail Returned Tue 10/31 1:56 PM
Mail sent to Jamari Johnson returned as undeliverable re7 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination,,6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Returned Mail
9 9 misc Mail Returned Tue 10/31 1:54 PM
Mail sent to Robert O. Johnson returned as undeliverable re7 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination,,6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Returned Mail
Monday, October 23, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/30 11:40 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert O. Johnson. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 10/20 10:55 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 11/3/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/19 2:00 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, this proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom guidance and setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ (wft, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
5 5 misc Mail Returned Thu 10/05 1:50 PM
Mail sent to Robert and Jamari Johnson returned as undeliverable re4 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 09/27 9:22 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/12 4:07 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (cjl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/12 4:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert O. Johnson. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/12 4:03 PM
COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Victoria George, Jason Louie, James Williams, Jr, Laverne Williams, Parrig Williams. Filed by Robert O. Johnson, Jamark Johnson. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023.(cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet