California Eastern District Court
Judge:William B Shubb
Case #: 2:23-cv-01960
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Jul 03, 2024
Case in other court:Sacramento County Superior Court, 23CV004390
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Bureau Veritas North America, Inc.
Represented By
Rebecca T. Benhuri
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristina Henderson
Represented By
Christopher Paul Brandes
Brock & Gonzales, LLP
contact info
Paul Henry Hirsch
Brock & Gonzales LLP
contact info
D. Aaron Brock
Brock & Gonzales, LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 03 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 07/03/2024 DISMISSING all claims in the above titled action in their entirety with prejudice. Each party is to bear her/its own fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Lopez, K)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 07/03 12:11 PM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 07/03/2024 DISMISSING all claims in the above titled action in their entirety with prejudice. Each party is to bear her/its own fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Lopez, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 06/27 1:22 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Kristina Henderson. (Hirsch, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 25, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 01/25 4:04 PM
STATUS PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/24/24 VACATING the 01/29/24 Status Conference and ORDERING that parties shall serve initial disclosures by 02/26/24; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 06/30/25 with any rebuttal disclosures due by 07/28/25; all discovery shall be completed by 08/25/25; Non-Dispositive Motions shall be heard no later than 08/25/25; Dispositive Motions filed by 10/20/25; Final Pretrial Conference set for 01/12/26 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb with separate pretrial statements due pursuant to Local Rules 281 and 282; a Settlement Conference will be set at the time of the Pretrial Conference; Jury Trial set for 03/03/26 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb.(Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
16 16 misc Status Report Tue 01/09 2:48 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Kristina Henderson. (Hirsch, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
15 15 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 12/11 12:13 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Hirsch, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 11/01 5:02 PM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Rebecca T. Benhuri. (Benhuri, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
13 13 service Certificate / Proof of Service Tue 09/26 4:43 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Bureau Veritas North America, Inc. re12 Civil New Case Documents for WBS. (Benhuri, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
12 12 misc Civil New Case Documents for WBS Fri 09/22 10:17 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
11 11 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Fri 09/22 10:15 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:23-cv-1960 WBS JDP. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
10 10 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 09/21 9:49 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benhuri, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
9 9 misc Jury Demand Tue 09/19 3:10 PM
DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Kristina Henderson. (Hirsch, Paul)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Interested Parties Tue 09/19 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kristina Henderson. (Hirsch, Paul)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/19 3:02 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Paul Henry Hirsch on behalf of Kristina Henderson. Attorney Hirsch, Paul Henry added. (Hirsch, Paul)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/19 2:58 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Christopher Paul Brandes on behalf of Kristina Henderson. Attorney Brandes, Christopher Paul added. (Brandes, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/13 4:42 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Bureau Veritas North America, Inc.. (Benhuri, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Tue 09/12 3:33 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
3 3 service Certificate / Proof of Service Tue 09/12 1:51 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Bureau Veritas North America, Inc. re2 Civil Cover Sheet,1 Notice of Removal,. (Benhuri, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Civil Cover Sheet Tue 09/12 1:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Bureau Veritas North America, Inc. (Benhuri, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 09/12 1:45 PM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 23CV004390 by Bureau Veritas North America, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11069750)(Benhuri, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michelle Stalnaker,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Declaration of Rebecca Benhuri,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 ,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2