California Northern District Court
Judge:Richard Seeborg
Case #: 3:23-cv-04683
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:May 29, 2024
Case in other court:Santa Clara County Superior Court, 23-cv-00599
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:10 AM PDT
Defendant
Katena Computing Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Lauren Trambley
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Jacob Taber
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
John R Hardin
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
David P. Chiappetta
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Coinmint, LLC
Represented By
Fletcher C. Alford
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Jason de Bretteville
Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth LLP
contact info
Kevin Liu
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Steven David Feldman
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 05 2024
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 23 Continuing Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 1/11/2024 continued to 1/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/5/2024. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2024)
GPO Jan 18 2024
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 25 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 1/25/2024 is continued to 3/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/18/2024. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2024)
GPO Apr 05 2024
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 45 to Enlarge Time and Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-1, 6-2, and 7-12. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/5/2024. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
GPO May 21 2024
by 8/8/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/21/2024. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2024)STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 52 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 5/30/2024 is continued to 8/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due
GPO May 29 2024
Order denying 43 Motion to Vacate and granting 27 Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on May 29, 2024. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
57 57 1 pgs order Judgment Wed 05/29 3:51 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on May 29, 2024. (rslc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
56 56 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Wed 05/29 9:48 AM
Order denying 43 Motion to Vacate and granting 27 Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on May 29, 2024. (rslc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
55 55 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 05/23 12:43 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: MOTION TO VACATE [#43] SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON MAY 30, 2024 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]