California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:23-cv-04686
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:10 AM PDT
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
Defendant
Google LLC
Defendant
Instagram, LLC
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
Defendant
Siculus, Inc.
Defendant
YouTube, LLC
Plaintiff
Ann Frank
Represented By
James R Marsh
Marsh Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Sin-Ting Mary Liu
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, February 05, 2024
16 16 misc Transcript Mon 02/05 10:16 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/26/2024, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stephen W. Franklin, telephone number (561)313-8439. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2024. (Franklin, Stephen)
Related: [-] (566 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order, (567 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order, (572 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order, (571 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order
Friday, January 26, 2024
15 15 minutes Discovery Hearing Fri 01/26 3:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Discovery Hearing held on 1/25/2024. Total Time in Court: 3h 24m. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Ayers, Lexi Hazam, Previn Warren, Emily Jeffcott, Thomas Huynh. Defendant Attorney: (Meta) Ashley Simonsen, Isaac Chaput, (Snap) Jonathan Blavin, (TikTok) Geoffrey Drake, Andrea Pierson, Amy Fiterman, (YouTube) Matt Donohue. (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2024)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/02 4:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Short Form Complaint against Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Google LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., YouTube, LLC. Filed by Ann Frank. (Liu, Sin-Ting)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
13 13 misc Transcript Wed 12/20 12:04 PM
Transcript of Proceedings (corrected to change date on title page) held on 12/14/2023, before Judge Peter H. Kang. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2024. (rre, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (486 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order
12 12 misc Transcript Wed 12/20 11:43 AM
***PLEASE DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NUMBER 511 FOR CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT. Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/14/2023, before Magistrate Judge Peter H. Kang. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2024. (rre, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/20/2023 (knm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (486 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
11 11 minutes Discovery Hearing Fri 12/15 10:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Discovery Hearing held on 12/14/2023. Fact and Expert Discovery Cut-Off Meeting: Parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding dates for fact discovery and expert discovery cut-off. This meeting must take place by January 19, 2024. Discovery Plan Proposal: A proposal for the discovery plan is due by January 19, 2024. Protective Order Briefing: Withdrawal of all briefing on the Protective Order appeal is due by December 18, 2023. Refiling of Protective Order briefing is due by December 18, 2023. No new arguments are permitted in the refiled Protective Order briefing. Defendants are allotted one page, single-spaced, to respond to State Plaintiffs' arguments on the Protective Order, due by December 18, 2023. State Plaintiffs are allotted a half-page, single-spaced, for their proposed carve-out on the Protective Order, due by December 18, 2023. Electronic Stored Information (ESI) Conference: Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding ESI, with their ESI vendors present, by December 29, 2023, to narrow currently pending ESI issues. ESI Proposed Language Chart: The ESI proposed language chart is due by January 12, 2024. Written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 1:11pm-2:31pm (2hr 20m). Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Seeger, Christopher Ayers, Lexi Hazam, Previn Warren, Bianca Miyata, Barney Eskandari, Megan O'Neill, Christian Lewis. Defendant Attorney: Ashley Simonsen, Greg Halperin, Isaac Chaput, Jonathan Blavin, Andrea Pierson, Christopher Chiou, Andrew Kramer, Rose Ehler, Geoffrey Drake, David Mattern, Brian Ercole, Stephanie Schuster, Laura Lopez, Paul Schmidt. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2023)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
10 10 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Stipulation Mon 11/27 3:22 PM
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Terminating as Moot 3 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym; Granting 9 Stipulation Regarding Plaintiff Proceeding Under Pseudonym. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
9 9 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 11/21 6:24 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Plaintiff Proceeding Under Pseudonym filed by Ann Frank. (Liu, Sin-Ting)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 10/27 1:15 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE, You are hereby notified that the Motion Hearing previously set for 10/31/2023 is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 24, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 09/24 9:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James R Marsh (Marsh, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 10:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Google LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 16, 2023
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Sat 09/16 8:02 AM
Proposed Summons. (Liu, Sin-Ting)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/13 9:31 AM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 09/13 8:14 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PER CASE, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION [err201]. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by Ann Frank (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Wed 09/13 8:22 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Frank v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 23-cv-04686 cc: JPMDL (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 09/12 6:41 PM
MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by Ann Frank. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 9/26/2023. Replies due by 10/3/2023.(Liu, Sin-Ting)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/12 5:33 PM
Proposed Summons. (Liu, Sin-Ting)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/12 5:16 PM
COMPLAINT (Master Short Form and Demand for Jury Trial) against Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Google LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., YouTube, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18637221.). Filed byAnn Frank.(Liu, Sin-Ting)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet