Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erik P Kimball
Case #: 9:23-bk-17306
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Oct 11, 2023
Claims Deadline:Dec 15, 2023

Debtor
Lemnature Aquafarms Corporation
1991 74th Ave
Vero Beach, FL 32966
Represented By
Lawrence M Kosto
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Nicole Testa Mehdipour
United States Bankruptcy Trustee 6278 North Federal Highway Suite 408
Ft Lauderdale, FL 33308
Represented By
Steven R Wirth
contact info
David C. Cimo, Esq
contact info
Nicole Testa Mehdipour
contact info
David B Marks
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 03/03/2025 3:22 PM EST
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 09/12 1:26 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 23-17306 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A43058427. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 104 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF] Tue 09/12 1:19 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $338] (Kosto, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset) Tue 09/12 1:22 PM
**No Notice Served - See Replacement Entry at ECF#5** Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Mehdipour, Nicole Testa. Meeting of Creditors to be held by Video Conference on 10/11/2023 at 08:30 AM at www.Zoom.us - Mehdipour: Meeting ID 975 082 9490, Passcode 1279837759, Phone (954) 399-2757. Proofs of Claim due by 11/21/2023. (Kosto, Lawrence) *Modified on 9/12/2023 to Add Zoom Location Information* (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
3 3 attydoc Disclosure of Compensation Tue 09/12 1:22 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Lawrence M Kosto. (Kosto, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 09/12 1:23 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor LEMNATURE AQUAFARMS CORPORATION. (Kosto, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) Tue 09/12 5:00 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Nicole Testa Mehdipour. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 10/11/2023 at 09:30 AM at www.Zoom.us - Mehdipour: Meeting ID 975 082 9490, Passcode 1279837759, Phone (954) 399-2757. (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-]