New York Western District Court
Judge:Elizabeth A Wolford
Case #: 6:23-cv-06517
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Nov 03, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 4:42 AM EST
Defendant
Carolina Group
Defendant
Cna Financial
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Giesha Kimbrough
Defendant
Loews Corporation
Defendant
liz auginaga
Defendant
scott lindquist
Defendant
jane possell
Defendant
susan stone
Plaintiff
Knowledge Allah
d/b/a Allah's Kitchen LLC Allah's Kitchen LLC 200 Park Point Drive
Rochester, NY 14623
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Geisha Kimbrough
Terminated: 09/14/2023
Defendant
Dino Robusto
Terminated: 09/14/2023


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, November 03, 2023
5 5 order Judgment Fri 11/03 10:18 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Carolina Group, Cna Financial, Loews Corporation, Dino Robusto, Giesha Kimbrough, John Doe, jane possell, liz auginaga, scott lindquist, susan stone against Knowledge Allah. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 11/03/2023. (DMK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
4 4 order Text Order Thu 11/02 4:04 PM
TEXT ORDER. On September 18, 2023, the Court entered an Order to Show Cause (Dkt. 3) requiring Plaintiff Knowledge Allah d/b/a Allah's Kitchen LLC ("Plaintiff") to show cause why he should not be required to obtain counsel in order to proceed with this action. The deadline to respond to the Order to Show Cause was October 18, 2023. ( Id . at 1-2). Plaintiff was warned that failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause could result in the dismissal of this action. No response was filed. Further, on October 11, 2023, Plaintiff's check for the civil filing fee of $402.00 was returned for insufficient funds. Plaintiff was advised that he needed to send a certified check or money order in the amount of $455.00 comprised of $402.00 for the filing fee and $53.00 for the returned check fee, but has not done so. The Court hereby dismisses the matter without prejudice. See Lattanzio v. COMTA , 481 F.3d 137, 140 (2d Cir. 2007) ("[A] sole member of a limited liability company must bear the burdens that accompany the benefits of the corporate form and may appear in federal court only through a licensed attorney."). The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/02/2023. (CDH) (A copy of this Text Order was mailed to Plaintiff)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
utility Remark Wed 10/11 11:55 AM
Remark: Plaintiff's check for the civil filing fee of $402.00 was returned for insufficient funds. The Finance Department has mailed a notice to the plaintiff informing him to send a certified check or money order in the amount of $455.00 comprised of $402.00 for the filing fee and $53.00 for the returned check fee. (JHF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 09/18 3:48 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/18/2023. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 09/18/2023. (CDH) (A copy of this was mailed to Plaintiff)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/14 5:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carolina Group, Cna Financial, John Doe, Giesha Kimbrough, Loews Corporation, Dino Robusto, liz auginaga, scott lindquist, jane possell, susan stone, filed by Knowledge Allah. (JHF)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 09/14 6:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Dino Robusto. (JHF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/12 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Carolina Group, Cna Financial, John Doe, Geisha Kimbrough, Giesha Kimbrough, Loews Corporation, Dino Robusto, liz auginaga, scott lindquist, jane possell, susan stone, filed by Allah's Kitchen LLC. (JHF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 09/12 2:29 PM
Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 600000489. (JHF)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 09/12 2:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Carolina Group, Cna Financial, John Doe, Geisha Kimbrough, Loews Corporation, liz auginaga, scott lindquist, jane possell, susan stone. (JHF)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Tue 09/12 2:33 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (JHF)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Tue 09/12 2:35 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] . (JHF)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 09/12 2:36 PM
Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Pro Se Assistance Program, Civil Case Timeline and ADR Notification given to plaintiff. (JHF)
Related: [-]