California Central District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-04133
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2023
Terminated:Aug 14, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2023 12:44 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
David Ramiro Narvaez (1)
Terminated: 08/14/2023
Represented By
Kim Savo
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/27/2023 9:36 AM PDT
Monday, August 14, 2023
Notice to Northern District of Georgia of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Defendant David Ramiro Narvaez. The clerk will transmit any restricted documents via email. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and any text-only entries via the case number link. The following document link(s) is also provided:10 Warrant of Removal and Commitment to Another District. If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to email address CrimIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov (mhe)
Related: [-]
1 1 AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant David Ramiro Narvaez, originating in the Northern District of Georgia. Defendant charged in violation of: 18:3583. Signed by agent A Bailon, USMS, DUSM. USA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant David Ramiro Narvaez; defendants Year of Birth: 1989; date of arrest: 8/11/2023 USMS# REG 70089-019 (mhe)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant David Ramiro Narvaez (mhe)
Related: [-]
4 4 SEALED Defendant David Ramiro Narvaez arrested on warrant issued by the USDC Northern District of Georgia at Atlanta.(mhe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Charging Documents
5 5 MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi as to Defendant David Ramiro Narvaez. Defendant arraigned and states true name is Ramiro David Narvaez. Attorney: Kim Savo for David Ramiro Narvaez, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders defendant Permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody or currently in the custody of the US Marshal. Court Smart: CS 8/14/23. (mhe)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi as to Defendant David Ramiro Narvaez, (mhe)
Related: [-]
7 7 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant David Ramiro Narvaez. (mhe)
Related: [-]
8 8 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant David Ramiro Narvaez. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (mhe)
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER OF RIGHTS approved by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi as to Defendant David Ramiro Narvaez. (mhe)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs WARRANT OF REMOVAL AND COMMITMENT by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi that Defendant David Ramiro Narvaez be removed to the Northern District of Georgia (mhe)
Related: [-]