Vancise v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-04689 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Instagram, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Siculus, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Snap, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Christina Vancise
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/26/2024, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stephen W. Franklin, telephone number (561)313-8439. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2024. (Franklin, Stephen) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Discovery Hearing held on 1/25/2024. Total Time in Court: 3h 24m. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Ayers, Lexi Hazam, Previn Warren, Emily Jeffcott, Thomas Huynh. Defendant Attorney: (Meta) Ashley Simonsen, Isaac Chaput, (Snap) Jonathan Blavin, (TikTok) Geoffrey Drake, Andrea Pierson, Amy Fiterman, (YouTube) Matt Donohue. (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2024) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Transcript of Proceedings (corrected to change date on title page) held on 12/14/2023, before Judge Peter H. Kang. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2024. (rre, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ***PLEASE DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NUMBER 511 FOR CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT. Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/14/2023, before Magistrate Judge Peter H. Kang. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2024. (rre, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/20/2023 (knm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
minutes
Discovery Hearing
Fri 12/15 10:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Discovery Hearing held on 12/14/2023. Fact and Expert Discovery Cut-Off Meeting: Parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding dates for fact discovery and expert discovery cut-off. This meeting must take place by January 19, 2024. Discovery Plan Proposal: A proposal for the discovery plan is due by January 19, 2024. Protective Order Briefing: Withdrawal of all briefing on the Protective Order appeal is due by December 18, 2023. Refiling of Protective Order briefing is due by December 18, 2023. No new arguments are permitted in the refiled Protective Order briefing. Defendants are allotted one page, single-spaced, to respond to State Plaintiffs' arguments on the Protective Order, due by December 18, 2023. State Plaintiffs are allotted a half-page, single-spaced, for their proposed carve-out on the Protective Order, due by December 18, 2023. Electronic Stored Information (ESI) Conference: Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding ESI, with their ESI vendors present, by December 29, 2023, to narrow currently pending ESI issues. ESI Proposed Language Chart: The ESI proposed language chart is due by January 12, 2024. Written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 1:11pm-2:31pm (2hr 20m). Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Seeger, Christopher Ayers, Lexi Hazam, Previn Warren, Bianca Miyata, Barney Eskandari, Megan O'Neill, Christian Lewis. Defendant Attorney: Ashley Simonsen, Greg Halperin, Isaac Chaput, Jonathan Blavin, Andrea Pierson, Christopher Chiou, Andrew Kramer, Rose Ehler, Geoffrey Drake, David Mattern, Brian Ercole, Stephanie Schuster, Laura Lopez, Paul Schmidt. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2023) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Saturday, September 16, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Proposed Summons. (Liu, Sin-Ting) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 09/13 9:45 AM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT (Master Short Form and Demand for Jury Trial) against Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18637489.). Filed byChristina Vancise.(Liu, Sin-Ting) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Create Case Association
Wed 09/13 10:41 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 4:22-md-03047-YGR. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 09/13 10:45 AM
DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 3047, Vancise v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 23-cv-04689-YGR cc: JPMDL (mcl, COURT STAFF) |