California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 5:23-cv-04615
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Case in other court:Santa Clara County Superior Court, 23CV415679
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 12:27 AM PST
Defendant
Terex Corporation
Represented By
William T. Nagle
Bowles & Verna
contact info
Kourtney M Speer
Bowles & Verna LLP
contact info
Defendant
United Rentals (North America), Inc.
Sutton & Murphy 26056 Acero
Mission Viejo, CA 92691
Represented By
Michael Scott Sutton
Sutton & Murphy
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as subrogee for Acco Engineered Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Anna Joy Monteleone
Michael Sullivan And Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Ozzie Lee
Represented By
John Charles Stein
The Boccardo Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/13 3:05 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Terex Corporation.. (Speer, Kourtney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 09/12 1:45 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/12 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William T. Nagle (Nagle, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/12 9:48 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
5 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Terex Corporation . (Speer, Kourtney)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
4 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Terex Corporation re1 Notice of Removal,2 Certificate of Interested Entities,3 Declaration in Support (Speer, Kourtney)
Related: [-]
3 3 Declaration of Kourtney M. Speer in Support of1 Notice of Removal, filed byTerex Corporation. Related [+] (Speer, Kourtney)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Terex Corporation (Speer, Kourtney)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara. Their case number is 23CV415679. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18626138). Filed byTerex Corporation.(Speer, Kourtney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Pleadings and papers,
Att: 3 Exhibit State court docket,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used. Please use our most recent version (10/2020) found on our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Terex Corporation (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Use Current Civil Cover Sheet off our website. www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Terex Corporation (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]