California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 3:23-cv-04693
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Mar 07, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 1:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Director of the National USCIS
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Director of the San Francisco Asylum Office
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
District Director of the San Francisco District of the USCIS
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Secretary of Homeland Security of the United States
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Attorney General
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Di Wang
Represented By
Ke Ye
Mino Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
6 6 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Summons Issued as to Director of the National USCIS, Director of the San Francisco Asylum Office, District Director of the San Francisco District of the USCIS, Secretary of Homeland Security of the United States, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Summons. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Di Wang identifying Other Affiliate USCIS, Other Affiliate Dir SF Asylum Ofc, Other Affiliate Dir SF Dist, Other Affiliate Dir USCIS, Other Affiliate Sec DHS, Other Affiliate US AG, Other Affiliate Di Wang for Di Wang. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18638042.). Filed byDi Wang.(Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet