California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward J Davila
Referred: Pslc Hhl
Case #: 5:23-cv-04636
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Mar 12, 2024
Defendant
L. Dossman
Defendant
L. Perez
Plaintiff
Toriano G. Hudson

GPO Jan 24 2024
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING 8 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS PREMATURE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/24/2023. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). A copy of this Order and two copies of the court form complaint were mailed to Plaintiff.

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 02, 2024
14 14 misc Affidavit Mon 12/02 4:26 PM
AFFIDAVIT by Toriano G. Hudson.(far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/21 8:31 AM
SUBMISSION OF MEDICAL PROOF by Toriano G. Hudson(far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
12 12 order Judgment Tue 03/12 1:54 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/12/2024. (crr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Tue 03/12 1:52 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/12/2024. (crr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
10 10 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties 1 - Terminate Deadlines Wed 01/24 4:38 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING 8 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS PREMATURE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/24/2023. (crr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 01/24 4:33 PM
ORDER GRANTING 6 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/24/2023. (crr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
8 8 motion Summary Judgment PSP Mon 01/22 1:57 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Toriano G. Hudson. Responses due by 2/20/2024. Replies due by 3/5/2024. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
7 7 misc Prison Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 10/03 6:31 AM
Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Toriano G. Hudson. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP - CDCR Mon 10/02 9:03 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Toriano G. Hudson, CDCR # AX4560. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint Mon 10/02 8:58 AM
COMPLAINT against L. Dossman, L. Perez. Filed byToriano G. Hudson. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Fri 09/15 11:12 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/23/2023. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: CDCR Prisoner IFP Motion Wed 09/13 9:33 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk has received plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, Toriano G. Hudson AX4560, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (far, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by e-mail (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Clerk's Notice to File Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint/Habeas Petition on Form Wed 09/13 9:32 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 10/23/2023. (far, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by e-mail (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/13 9:29 AM
NOTICE re Grievance re Continued Harassment and Reprisal by Toriano G. Hudson(far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope