Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-01712

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jacob A Brown
Case #: 3:23-ap-00081
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Oct 04, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Triumph Financial Services LLC
Represented By
Triumph Financial Services LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey D Cohen
Cohen & Palombo P.C.
contact info
Timothy L Frey
Cohen & Palombo P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
28 28 3 pgs order Order / Judgment By District Court/11th Circuit Court of Appeals re: Appeal Fri 10/04 3:38 PM
Order entered on August 6, 2024 by Judge Judge Timothy J Corrigan, Re: Appeal on Civil Action Number: 3-23-cv-1333, Motions to Withdraw the Reference are DENIED 3-23-cv-1230; 3-23-cv-1331 and 3-23-cv-1333 Related [+]. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 9 ,12
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/04 3:40 PM
Adversary Case 3:23-ap-81 Closed. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 09/19 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #26 )
Monday, September 16, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Mon 09/16 1:01 PM
Final Order Dismissing Adversary with Prejudice Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Cathy P.) Modified on 9/16/2024 (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 24 , ,25
Friday, September 13, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation (AP) Fri 09/13 2:29 PM
Amended Stipulation for Final Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by Jason B. Burnett on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC Related [+]. (Burnett, Jason)
Related: [-] 24
24 24 misc Stipulation (AP) Fri 09/13 2:07 PM
Joint Stipulation for Final Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by Jason B. Burnett on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Burnett, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
court Compromise Cross-Reference Tue 09/10 11:19 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. (3-23-bk-01712-JAB, Doc. No. 876) . (Cathy P.)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
court Compromise Cross-Reference Tue 09/10 11:05 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. (3-23-bk-01712-JAB, Doc. No. 834) . (Cathy P.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
23 23 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 06/06 5:28 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Jeffrey Cohen: Attorney for Plaintiff; Representative for Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc: Tony Mangini; Jason Burnett & Jared Ullman: Attorney's for Defendant; Representatives for Triumph Financial Services LLC: Dan Mourning & George Thorson WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Status Conference Held/Concluded -Complaint by Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc. against Triumph Financial Services LLC. Nature of Suit: [91 (Declaratory judgment)] (Cohen, Jeffrey) Doc 1 -Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Continue All Deadline (Second Joint Motion) Entered 11/27/23 Doc 19 -Order Scheduling Status Conference Directing Parties and Client Representative to Appear in Person Doc 21 Note: -Motion for Withdrawal of Reference Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc. Filed on 10/20/23 Doc 9 -Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference to District Court. Case No. 3-23-cv-1333-BJD Entered 11/9/23 Doc 12 Pending: -Motion to Amend Adversary Complaint (Contains negative notice) Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc. Doc 10 Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
22 22 motion Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event) (AP) Fri 05/31 3:41 PM
Motion FOR AN ORDER EXCUSING OR MODIFYING THE REQUIREMENT FOR A PARTY REPRESENTATIVE TO APPEAR AT THE JUNE 4, 2024 STATUS CONFERENCE IN PERSON Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc. Related [+]. (Frey, Timothy)
Related: [-] 21
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 05/28 2:14 PM
Order Scheduling Status Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 11:00 AM at Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4C, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street . Service Instructions: Jason Burnett is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 19
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Tue 03/12 12:56 PM
Change of Firm Name submitted to the Court on March 12, 2024, by Attorney Jeffrey D. Cohen, of Cohen & Frey P.C., which was f/k/a Cohen & Palombo P.C. (Sara M.)
Related: [-]
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Tue 03/12 1:02 PM
Change of Firm Name submitted to the Court on March 12, 2024, by Attorney Timothy L. Frey, of Cohen & Frey P.C., which was f/k/a Cohen & Palombo P.C. (Sara M.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
20 20 misc Proof of Service (AP) Thu 11/30 11:32 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Second Joint Motion to Continue All Deadlines [D.E. 18]. Filed by Jason B. Burnett on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC Related [+]. (Burnett, Jason)
Related: [-] 19
Monday, November 27, 2023
19 19 order Extend Time Mon 11/27 2:50 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Continue All Deadline (Second Joint Motion) Related [+]. Service Instructions: Jason Burnett is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Tonya)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
18 18 motion Motion to Extend Time (AP) Tue 11/21 4:32 PM
Motion to Extend Time/Continue All Deadlines Filed by Jared A Ullman on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Ullman, Jared) Modified on 11/22/2023 (Perkins, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
17 17 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 11/13 5:05 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Corporate parents added to case: TBK Bank, SSB. Filed by Jared A Ullman on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Ullman, Jared)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Notice of Deficient Filing (AP) Mon 11/13 9:20 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Statement of Corporate Ownership Related [+]. Compliance required no later than 11/30/2023. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 7
Saturday, November 11, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 11/12 11:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 11/11/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #12 )
Friday, November 10, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 11/10 3:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel Filed by Jared A Ullman on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Ullman, Jared)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 11/10 2:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael W Ullman on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Ullman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
12 12 court Transmittal of Notice of / or Record on Appeal to USDC or 11th Circuit Court Thu 11/09 3:31 PM
Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference to District Court. Case No. 3-23-cv-1333-BJD Related [+]. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, October 26, 2023
11 11 misc Proof of Service (AP) Thu 10/26 2:09 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Joint Motion to Continue All Deadlines. Filed by Jason B. Burnett on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC Related [+]. (Burnett, Jason)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
10 10 motion Motion to Amend (AP) Tue 10/24 5:12 PM
Motion to Amend Adversary Complaint Contains negative notice. Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc. Related [+]. (Frey, Timothy)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Ex. A - Amended Adversary Complaint
Friday, October 20, 2023
9 9 motion Motion for Withdrawal of Reference (AP) Fri 10/20 4:03 PM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Filing Fee Paid. Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc.. (Frey, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Motion to Withdraw Reference in USA Motor
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Order Withdrawing Reference in USA Motor
8 8 order Generic Order Fri 10/20 2:37 PM
Order Granting Motion (Joint) to Continue All Deadlines Related [+]. Service Instructions: Jason Burnett is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 7
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Fri 10/20 4:09 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Withdrawal of Reference([LINK:3:23-ap-00081-JAB] ) [motion,mwdrefad] ( 188.00). Receipt Number A73594845, Amount Paid $ 188.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
7 7 motion Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event) (AP) Wed 10/18 4:36 PM
Joint Motion to Continue All Deadlines Filed by Jason B. Burnett on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Burnett, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
6 6 misc Summons Service Executed Fri 09/22 10:12 AM
Service Executed on Triumph Financial Services LLC of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc. Related [+]. (Frey, Timothy)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
court Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required (SB) Fri 09/22 9:45 AM
ERROR NOTIFICATION to Timothy Frey. The event you selected does not match the Pdf image you filed. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS FILING, Related [+]. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, September 21, 2023
5 5 misc Proof of Service (AP) Thu 09/21 2:41 PM
DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Docket event/PDF combination do not match). NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS DOCUMENT. Proof of Service Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc. Related [+]. (Frey, Timothy) Modified on 09/22/2023 (Perkins, Cathy)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 09/21 2:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc.. (Frey, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
3 3 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Thu 09/14 12:56 PM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 10/16/2023. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 09/13 11:29 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Jeffrey D Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc.. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Wed 09/13 11:26 AM
Complaint by Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc. against Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Verify Fee) Nature of Suit: [91 (Declaratory judgment)]. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]