Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc. v. Triumph Financial Services LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-01712
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-01712
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jacob A Brown |
Case #: | 3:23-ap-00082 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 02, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Triumph Financial Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, December 02, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 12/02 12:03 PM
Adversary Case 3:23-ap-82 Closed. (Cathy P.) |
||
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Final Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice . . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Cathy P.) Modified on 9/16/2024 (Cathy P.) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Joint Stipulation for Final Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by Jason B. Burnett on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Burnett, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
court
Compromise Cross-Reference
Tue 09/10 11:20 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. (3-23-bk-01712-JAB, Doc. No. 876) . (Cathy P.) |
||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
court
Compromise Cross-Reference
Tue 09/10 11:07 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. (3-23-bk-01712-JAB, Doc. No. 834) . (Cathy P.) |
||
Tuesday, June 04, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Jeffrey Cohen: Attorney for Plaintiff; Representative for Baxter, Bailey & Associates LLC: Edgar Davidson; Jason Burnett & Jared Ullman: Attorney's for Defendant; Client Representatives for Triumph Financial Services LLC: Dan Mourning & George Thorson WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Status Conference Held/Concluded -Complaint by Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc. against Triumph Financial Services LLC. Nature of Suit: [91 (Declaratory judgment)] (Cohen, Jeffrey) Doc 1 -Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Continue All Deadlines (Second Joint Motion) Entered 11/27/23 Doc 19 -Order Scheduling Status Conference Directing Parties and Client Representative to Appear in Person Doc 21 Note: -Motion for Withdrawal of Reference Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc. Filed on 10/20/23 Doc 9 -Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference to District Court. Case No. 3-23-cv-1334-MMH Entered 11/9/23 Doc 12 Pending: -Motion to Amend Adversary Complaint (Contains negative notice) Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc. on 10/24/23 Doc 10 Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Motion FOR AN ORDER EXCUSING OR MODIFYING THE REQUIREMENT FOR A PARTY REPRESENTATIVE TO APPEAR AT THE JUNE 4, 2024 STATUS CONFERENCE IN PERSON Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc. . (Frey, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Order Scheduling Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 11:00 AM at Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4C, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street . Service Instructions: Jason Burnett is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Cathy P.) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
court
COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
Tue 03/12 12:56 PM
Change of Firm Name submitted to the Court on March 12, 2024, by Attorney Jeffrey D. Cohen, of Cohen & Frey P.C., which was f/k/a Cohen & Palombo P.C. (Sara M.) |
||
court
COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
Tue 03/12 1:02 PM
Change of Firm Name submitted to the Court on March 12, 2024, by Attorney Timothy L. Frey, of Cohen & Frey P.C., which was f/k/a Cohen & Palombo P.C. (Sara M.) |
||
Thursday, November 30, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Proof of Service of Order Granting Second Joint Motion to Continue All Deadlines [D.E. 18]. Filed by Jason B. Burnett on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC . (Burnett, Jason) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Continue All Deadlines (Second Joint Motion) . Service Instructions: Jason Burnett is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Tonya) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Motion to Extend Time/Continue All Deadlines Filed by Jared A Ullman on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Ullman, Jared) Modified on 11/22/2023 (Perkins, Cathy) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership. Corporate parents added to case: TBK Bank, SSB. Filed by Jared A Ullman on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Ullman, Jared) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Notice of Deficient Filing. Statement of Corporate Ownership . Compliance required no later than 11/30/2023. (Cathy P.) |
|
Saturday, November 11, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 11/11/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel Filed by Jared A Ullman on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Ullman, Jared) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael W Ullman on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Ullman, Michael) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference to District Court. Case No. 3-23-cv-1334-MMH . (Cathy P.) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Proof of Service of Order Granting Joint Motion to Continue All Deadlines. Filed by Jason B. Burnett on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC . (Burnett, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Motion to Amend Adversary Complaint Contains negative notice. Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc. . (Frey, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Filing Fee Paid. Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc.. (Frey, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() Order Granting Motion (Joint) to Continue All Deadlines . Service Instructions: Jason Burnett is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Cathy P.) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Fri 10/20 4:09 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Withdrawal of Reference([LINK:3:23-ap-00082-JAB] ) [motion,mwdrefad] ( 188.00). Receipt Number A73594845, Amount Paid $ 188.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Joint Motion to Continue All Deadlines Filed by Jason B. Burnett on behalf of Defendant Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Burnett, Jason) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Service Executed on Triumph Financial Services LLC of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc. . (Frey, Timothy) |
|
court
Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required (SB)
Fri 09/22 9:46 AM
ERROR NOTIFICATION to Timothy Frey. The event you selected does not match the Pdf image you filed. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS FILING, . (Cathy P.) |
||
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Docket event/PDF combination do not match). NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS DOCUMENT. Proof of Service Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc. . (Frey, Timothy) Modified on 09/22/2023 (Perkins, Cathy) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Plaintiff Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc.. (Frey, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 10/16/2023. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Jeffrey D Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc.. (Cohen, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Complaint by Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc. against Triumph Financial Services LLC. (Verify Fee) Nature of Suit: [91 (Declaratory judgment)]. (Cohen, Jeffrey) |