Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joshua P Searcy
Case #: 6:23-bk-60451
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Dismissed:May 03, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Elkhorn Exploration Co.
2702 E. Fifth Street
Tyler, TX 75701
Represented By
Robert DeMarco, III
Demarco-Mitchell, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 09/12/2023 7:00 PM CDT
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
crditcrd none Wed 09/13 12:08 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-60451 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A13021676, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 69 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 09/13 12:07 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Elkhorn Exploration Co., Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/12/2023.Document Due 09/20/2023.(DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing Wed 09/13 1:44 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; and (3) the attorney will maintain the originally signed declaration for at least one year after final disposition of the case. Filed by Elkhorn Exploration Co. Related [+]. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Elkhorn Exploration Co., Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/12/2023.Document Due 09/20/2023. filed by Debtor Elkhorn Exploration Co.