California Northern District Court
Judge:Peter H Kang
Case #: 3:23-cv-04695
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Jan 10, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 1:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Douglas Parking Company
Represented By
Ari Jonathan Lauer
Law Offices Of Ari J. Lauer
contact info
Plaintiff
David Robinson
Represented By
Richard J. Morin
Law Office Of Rick Morin, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/10 8:05 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Robinson (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 12/01 10:36 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang granting 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time. (phklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 11/30 10:12 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Douglas Parking Company. (Lauer, Ari)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 10/18 4:50 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Douglas Parking Company.. (Lauer, Ari)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
9 9 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 10/17 7:19 AM
STIPULATION to extend time to respond to initial complaint filed by David Robinson. (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/12 9:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Robinson. Douglas Parking Company served on 10/12/2023, answer due 11/2/2023. (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 09/21 10:32 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Robinson.. (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 09/14 3:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Douglas Parking Company. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case Thu 09/14 3:23 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/13 1:17 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 09/13 10:31 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by David Robinson (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 09/13 10:26 AM
Proposed Summons. (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/13 10:24 AM
COMPLAINT against Douglas Parking Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18638801.). Filed byDavid Robinson.(Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet