California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:23-cv-04693
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Mar 07, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 1:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Director of the National USCIS
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Director of the San Francisco Asylum Office
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
District Director of the San Francisco District of the USCIS
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Secretary of Homeland Security of the United States
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Attorney General
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Di Wang
Represented By
Ke Ye
Mino Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/06 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Di Wang (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 11/15 8:39 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 17 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. Joint Status Report or Order for Dismissal due by 5/8/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
17 17 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 11/13 12:42 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings filed by Director of the National USCIS, Director of the San Francisco Asylum Office, District Director of the San Francisco District of the USCIS, Secretary of Homeland Security of the United States, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/13 12:38 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Director of the National USCIS, Director of the San Francisco Asylum Office, District Director of the San Francisco District of the USCIS, Secretary of Homeland Security of the United States, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/13 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/10 4:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Di Wang. U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services served on 10/6/2023, answer due 12/5/2023. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/10 4:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Di Wang. U.S. Attorney General served on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/10 4:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Di Wang. Secretary of Homeland Security of the United States served on 10/6/2023, answer due 12/5/2023. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/10 4:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Di Wang. District Director of the San Francisco District of the USCIS served on 9/18/2023, answer due 11/17/2023. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/10 4:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Di Wang. Director of the National USCIS served on 10/6/2023, answer due 12/5/2023. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/10 4:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Di Wang. Director of the San Francisco Asylum Office served on 9/18/2023, answer due 11/17/2023. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/05 12:18 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Di Wang.. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 10/05 11:55 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/19/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
6 6 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Wed 09/13 2:57 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 09/13 2:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Director of the National USCIS, Director of the San Francisco Asylum Office, District Director of the San Francisco District of the USCIS, Secretary of Homeland Security of the United States, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/13 9:38 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Wed 09/13 8:48 AM
Proposed Summons. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 09/13 8:46 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Di Wang identifying Other Affiliate USCIS, Other Affiliate Dir SF Asylum Ofc, Other Affiliate Dir SF Dist, Other Affiliate Dir USCIS, Other Affiliate Sec DHS, Other Affiliate US AG, Other Affiliate Di Wang for Di Wang. (Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/13 8:42 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18638042.). Filed byDi Wang.(Ye, Ke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet