California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:23-cv-04700
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Nov 02, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 02, 2023
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 11/02 7:47 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 7 Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
7 7 motion Dismiss Wed 11/01 2:14 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Farrell Hairell. Responses due by 11/15/2023. Replies due by 11/22/2023. (Maxson, Nayeli)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/12 5:33 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi.. (Highland, Erin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/15 7:51 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
4 4 order Social Security Procedural Order Thu 09/14 4:48 PM
PROCEDURAL ORDER FOR REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY DECISION UNDER 42 U.S.C. 405(g) (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/13 1:25 PM
Case assigned to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/13 1:14 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Farrell Hairell. (Maxson, Nayeli)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/13 12:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Kilolo, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Kijakazi. Filed byRobert Farrell Hairell.(Maxson, Nayeli)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet