California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 4:23-cv-04699
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Jan 26, 2024
Case in other court:Alameda County Superior Court, 23CV037485
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 1:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Richard Battersby
Represented By
Michael James Quirk
Oakland City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
City Of Oakland
1 Frank H. Ogawa Plaza 6th Floor
Oakland, CA 94612
Represented By
Michael James Quirk
Oakland City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Tyree Jackson
Represented By
Michael James Quirk
Oakland City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Oakland Public Works Department
Represented By
Michael James Quirk
Oakland City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Arthur Watson
Represented By
Michael James Quirk
Oakland City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy B. Glasper
2160 El Lago Drive
Oakley, CA 94561

GPO Oct 12 2023
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/9/2023. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/12/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Jan 26 2024
ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/26/2024. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Jan 26 2024
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of City Of Oakland, Oakland Public Works Department, Arthur Watson, Richard Battersby, Tyree Jackson against Timothy B. Glasper. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 26, 2024
19 19 oth_evt Judgment - Clerk Fri 01/26 8:17 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of City Of Oakland, Oakland Public Works Department, Arthur Watson, Richard Battersby, Tyree Jackson against Timothy B. Glasper. (ndr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
18 18 4 pgs order Order Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/26 8:16 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/26/2024. (ndr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 12/14 5:48 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management currently set on 12/19/2023 at 2:00 p.m. is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jlg, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
16 16 misc Case Management Statement Tue 12/12 2:22 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Defendants' Case Management Conference Statement filed by Richard Battersby, City Of Oakland, Tyree Jackson, Oakland Public Works Department, Arthur Watson. (Quirk, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 11/13 11:19 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court takes the pending5 motion to dismiss filings under submission. The hearing previously scheduled for November 16, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. is vacated. The Court will issue a written order. (kc, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/02 1:06 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re Docke No.5 . Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2023 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 10/12 1:02 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/9/2023. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/12/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/02 8:05 AM
Reset Hearing as to5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant F.R.C.P 12(b)(6) , See Docket No.12 : Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
12 12 oth_sup Re-notice motion Fri 09/29 4:45 PM
Renotice motion hearing Defendants' Renoticed Motion to Dissmiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P 12(b)(6) filed byRichard Battersby, City Of Oakland, Tyree Jackson, Oakland Public Works Department, Arthur Watson.(Quirk, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting to F.R.C.P 12(b)(6)Defendants' Renoticed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant
Thursday, September 28, 2023
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Telephonic Hearing (AT&T) Thu 09/28 10:11 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2023. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 02:00 PM. The 12/19/2023 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (ndr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/28 9:19 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 09/28/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
3 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:00 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Notice of Removal of Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C Section 1441 (a) from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV037485. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18639633). Filed byArthur Watson, City Of Oakland, Tyree Jackson, Richard Battersby, Oakland Public Works Department.(Quirk, Michael) Modified on 9/13/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Notice of Complex Determination Hearing,
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Affidavit of Timothy Glasper,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet