Consolidated
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047

California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:23-cv-04702
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Dec 06, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 1:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Meta Payments, Inc.
Defendant
YouTube, LLC
Defendant
XXVI Holdings, Inc.
Defendant
Whatsapp, Inc.
Defendant
TikTok, Inc.
Defendant
Snap, Inc.
Defendant
Siculus, Inc.
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
Defendant
Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC
Defendant
Instagram, LLC
Defendant
Google, LLC
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
Defendant
Facebook Holdings, LLC
Defendant
ByteDance, Inc.
Defendant
Alphabet, Inc.
Plaintiff
Knoch School District
Represented By
James Patrick Frantz
Frantz Law Group, Aplc
contact info
William B. Shinoff
Frantz Law Group, Aplc
contact info
Thomas W. King, III
Dillon Mccandless King Coulter & Graham, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, February 05, 2024
11 11 misc Transcript Mon 02/05 10:16 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/26/2024, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stephen W. Franklin, telephone number (561)313-8439. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2024. (Franklin, Stephen)
Related: [-] (566 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order, (567 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order, (572 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order, (571 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order
Friday, January 26, 2024
10 10 minutes Discovery Hearing Fri 01/26 3:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Discovery Hearing held on 1/25/2024. Total Time in Court: 3h 24m. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Ayers, Lexi Hazam, Previn Warren, Emily Jeffcott, Thomas Huynh. Defendant Attorney: (Meta) Ashley Simonsen, Isaac Chaput, (Snap) Jonathan Blavin, (TikTok) Geoffrey Drake, Andrea Pierson, Amy Fiterman, (YouTube) Matt Donohue. (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2024)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
9 9 misc Transcript Wed 12/20 12:04 PM
Transcript of Proceedings (corrected to change date on title page) held on 12/14/2023, before Judge Peter H. Kang. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2024. (rre, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (486 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order
8 8 misc Transcript Wed 12/20 11:43 AM
***PLEASE DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NUMBER 511 FOR CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT. Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/14/2023, before Magistrate Judge Peter H. Kang. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2024. (rre, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/20/2023 (knm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (486 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
7 7 minutes Discovery Hearing Fri 12/15 10:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Discovery Hearing held on 12/14/2023. Fact and Expert Discovery Cut-Off Meeting: Parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding dates for fact discovery and expert discovery cut-off. This meeting must take place by January 19, 2024. Discovery Plan Proposal: A proposal for the discovery plan is due by January 19, 2024. Protective Order Briefing: Withdrawal of all briefing on the Protective Order appeal is due by December 18, 2023. Refiling of Protective Order briefing is due by December 18, 2023. No new arguments are permitted in the refiled Protective Order briefing. Defendants are allotted one page, single-spaced, to respond to State Plaintiffs' arguments on the Protective Order, due by December 18, 2023. State Plaintiffs are allotted a half-page, single-spaced, for their proposed carve-out on the Protective Order, due by December 18, 2023. Electronic Stored Information (ESI) Conference: Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding ESI, with their ESI vendors present, by December 29, 2023, to narrow currently pending ESI issues. ESI Proposed Language Chart: The ESI proposed language chart is due by January 12, 2024. Written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 1:11pm-2:31pm (2hr 20m). Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Seeger, Christopher Ayers, Lexi Hazam, Previn Warren, Bianca Miyata, Barney Eskandari, Megan O'Neill, Christian Lewis. Defendant Attorney: Ashley Simonsen, Greg Halperin, Isaac Chaput, Jonathan Blavin, Andrea Pierson, Christopher Chiou, Andrew Kramer, Rose Ehler, Geoffrey Drake, David Mattern, Brian Ercole, Stephanie Schuster, Laura Lopez, Paul Schmidt. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2023)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 12/06 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Knoch School District (King, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/18 6:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Knoch School District. All Defendants.(King, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 09/13 3:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Alphabet, Inc., ByteDance, Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Google, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Payments, Inc., Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap, Inc., TikTok, Inc., Whatsapp, Inc., XXVI Holdings, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/13 3:11 PM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 09/13 1:59 PM
Proposed Summons. (King, Thomas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/13 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18640255.). Filed by Knoch School District.(King, Thomas) Modified on 9/13/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility MDL Member Case Wed 09/13 3:15 PM
DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: 4:22-md-03047-YGR Opened in California Northern District as 4:23-cv-04702-YGR cc: JPMDL (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]