California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:23-cv-04706
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 1:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
Represented By
Samuel Quinn Schleier
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Paul Augusto Alarcon
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Colton Parks
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Samuel Quinn Schleier
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Paul Augusto Alarcon
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Colton Parks
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
B. R.
Represented By
Adam B. Wolf
Peiffer Wolf Carr Kane Conway & Wise, LLP
contact info
Rachel Beth Abrams
Peiffer Wolf Carr Kane Conway & Wise
contact info
Angela J. Nehmens
Estey & Bomberger, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, January 06, 2025
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/06 1:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Short-Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by B. R.. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/09 11:05 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by B. R.. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
23 23 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/17 12:16 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Tue 10/17 8:49 AM
MEMBER CASE ASSIGNED TO MDL 3084: 3:23-cv-04706-CRB R. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al pursuant to Order Relating Cases (Docket 8 in 23-md-3084-CRB) cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order Thu 10/12 10:43 AM
REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/12/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
21 21 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 10/03 3:44 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND RASIER, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/27 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Quinn Schleier (Schleier, Samuel)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/27 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Colton Parks (Parks, Colton)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 09/27 4:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/27 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Augusto Alarcon (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
16 16 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 09/26 9:33 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B. R. re8 Summons Issued (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case Mon 09/25 2:37 PM
Notice of Related Actions Filed in MDL 3084 In re: Uber Technologies, Inc. Passenger Sexual Assault Litigation. (Rule 6.2(d) of the Rules of Procedure for the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation). (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 09/18 6:55 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 2 Motion for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 09/15 8:59 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 12/14/2023 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 12/13/2023. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/15 8:11 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/15/23.(as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Thursday, September 14, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 09/14 4:22 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/14/2023. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/14 4:16 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 9/14/2023.(bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 09/14 3:20 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (kc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 09/14 2:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 09/14 2:31 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 09/14 9:18 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by B. R... (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/14 8:19 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 09/13 3:06 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by B. R. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Wed 09/13 3:03 PM
Proposed Summons. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Protective Order Wed 09/13 3:01 PM
MOTION for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously; Memorandum of Law in Support filed by B. R.. Responses due by 9/27/2023.(Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 49 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/13 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18640752.). Filed byB. R..(Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet