California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 3:23-cv-04699
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Jan 26, 2024
Case in other court:Alameda County Superior Court, 23CV037485
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 1:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Richard Battersby
Represented By
Michael James Quirk
Oakland City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
City Of Oakland
1 Frank H. Ogawa Plaza 6th Floor
Oakland, CA 94612
Represented By
Michael James Quirk
Oakland City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Tyree Jackson
Represented By
Michael James Quirk
Oakland City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Oakland Public Works Department
Represented By
Michael James Quirk
Oakland City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Arthur Watson
Represented By
Michael James Quirk
Oakland City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy B. Glasper
2160 El Lago Drive
Oakley, CA 94561


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment Wed 09/27 3:50 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/27 1:16 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Timothy B. Glasper. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 09/21 1:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Battersby, City Of Oakland, Tyree Jackson, Oakland Public Works Department, Arthur Watson.. (Quirk, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 09/21 10:18 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Defendants have filed a Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
5 5 motion Dismiss Wed 09/20 3:54 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant F.R.C.P 12(b)(6) filed by Richard Battersby, City Of Oakland, Tyree Jackson, Oakland Public Works Department, Arthur Watson. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 10/4/2023. Replies due by 10/11/2023.(Quirk, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)
Friday, September 15, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 09/15 4:31 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard Battersby, City Of Oakland, Tyree Jackson, Oakland Public Works Department, Arthur Watson Defendants' Certification of Conflicts and Interested Entities or Persons (Quirk, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 09/13 2:11 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:00 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/13 1:38 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 09/13 12:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL Notice of Removal of Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C Section 1441 (a) from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV037485. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18639633). Filed byArthur Watson, City Of Oakland, Tyree Jackson, Richard Battersby, Oakland Public Works Department.(Quirk, Michael) Modified on 9/13/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Notice of Complex Determination Hearing,
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Affidavit of Timothy Glasper,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet