Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ada Brown
Case #: 3:23-cv-02057
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Sep 23, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 10:01 AM CDT
Defendant
Brendan Donovan
Represented By
Nathan Curtis Flanigin
Cooper & Scully P.C.
contact info
John Anthony Scully
Cooper & Scully PC
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Sheryl W O'Briant
Thamm & O'Briant LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexandra Schilling
Represented By
Braulio Enrique Gonzalez-Mejia
Mignucci & Gonzalez PLLC
contact info
Gustavo Mignucci
The Mignucci Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick Schilling
Represented By
Braulio Enrique Gonzalez-Mejia
Mignucci & Gonzalez PLLC
contact info
Gustavo Mignucci
The Mignucci Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency Inc
Terminated: 03/01/2024
Represented By
Robert Glen Wall
Segal Mccambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd
contact info
Randall G Walters
Walters Balido & Crain LLP
contact info
Patrick M Kemp
Segal Mccambridge
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, September 23, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Mon 09/23 11:39 AM
ORDER: The Court hereby STAYS all proceedings in this case until it has ruled on the pending9 ,10 motions. The Court ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSES this case during the pendency of the staypending ruling(s) on the remaining motions. IT IS ORDERED THAT the Parties may make further filings into this case only with express leave of court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/23/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
22 22 misc Stipulation Fri 03/01 9:46 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency Inc. (Kemp, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/14 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Partial Settlement filed by On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency Inc (Kemp, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/12 7:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Brendan Donovan. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Nathan Curtis Flanigin added to party Brendan Donovan(pty:dft) (Flanigin, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
19 19 motion Leave to File Wed 01/24 3:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Defenses to Plaintiffs' Original Petition filed by On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency Inc (Kemp, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 14, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order For ADR Thu 12/14 10:33 AM
MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Sheryl O'Briant as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. The clerk will send any requested documents to the mediator. Deadline for mediation is on or before 3/8/2024. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 12/14/2023) (frw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
17 17 adr Designation of Mediator Wed 12/13 2:49 PM
Designation of Mediator by On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency Inc. (Kemp, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
16 16 motion Substitute Party Fri 11/10 11:50 AM
Agreed MOTION to Substitute Party and to Amend Case Caption filed by On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency Inc. Party Naionwide Mutual Insurance Company added. (Kemp, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/08 3:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/7/2025 before Judge Ada Brown. Joinder of Parties due by 1/26/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 1/26/2024. Motions due by 9/5/2024. Discovery due by 8/5/2024. Pretrial Materials due by 11/19/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown. Deadline for mediation is on or before 3/8/2024. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/8/2023) (frw)
Related: [-]
utility Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Optional) Thu 11/09 10:42 AM
Hearing Modification: Bench Trial set for 1/7/2025 before Judge Ada Brown. Per Order at Docket15 . (cea)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
14 14 misc Status Report Fri 11/03 3:51 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency Inc. (Kemp, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
13 13 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Tue 10/31 12:10 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency Inc re12 Response/Objection (Kemp, Patrick)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Response/Objection Tue 10/31 12:08 PM
RESPONSE filed by On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency Inc re:10 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Kemp, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 13, 2023
11 11 order Status Report Order Fri 10/13 4:27 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report Due Three (3) Weeks from the Date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/13/2023) (agc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
10 10 motion Remand to State Court Tue 10/10 11:29 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Alexandra Schilling, Patrick Schilling with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gonzalez-Mejia, Braulio)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/09 4:59 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brendan Donovan with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Scully, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Page(s)
Thursday, October 05, 2023
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 10/05 1:19 PM
STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to File Initial Pleadings by Brendan Donovan. (Scully, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
7 7 misc Stipulation Thu 09/28 3:31 PM
Unopposed STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to File Initial Pleadings by On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency Inc. (Scully, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
6 6 misc Supplemental Document Mon 09/25 1:21 PM
Supplemental Document by On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency Inc as to1 Notice of Removal,,,, . (Kemp, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/19 8:36 AM
NOTICE of Designation of Local Counsel, Randall G. Walters re: 3 Order,, filed by On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency Inc (Kemp, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
4 4 qcref Brown Thu 09/14 12:41 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cfk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order Thu 09/14 9:30 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Civil Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where the attorney of record for a party does not reside or maintain their principal office in this district. Within twenty-one days of this Order, Defendant shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in sanctions being imposed for failure to comply with an order of the Court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/14/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 09/13 5:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Wall, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 09/13 5:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-14030955) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Kemp, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Index of Matters,
Att: 5 Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Cover Sheet Supplement