California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 3:23-cv-04714
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Apr 08, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 1:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Represented By
Adrienne Zack
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
USCIS San Francisco Field Office
630 Sansome Street
San Francisco, CA 94111
Represented By
Adrienne Zack
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Mariana Laurian Calderon
Represented By
Frank Patrick Sprouls
Law Office Of Ricci & Sprouls
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexander Peralta Campos
Represented By
Frank Patrick Sprouls
Law Office Of Ricci & Sprouls
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 08, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/08 12:39 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Petition of Writ of Mandamus, as provided by 28 USC 1361 by Mariana Laurian Calderon, Alexander Peralta Campos (Sprouls, Frank)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 03/13 5:35 PM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 14 THIRD Stipulation for Extension. Dispositive Motion due by 6/3/2024.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 03/13 4:34 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Third Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response and [Proposed] Order filed by Merrick B. Garland, USCIS San Francisco Field Office. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 02/13 9:59 AM
SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 12 Stipulation.(tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
12 12 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 02/12 7:24 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Second Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response and [Proposed] Order filed by Merrick B. Garland, USCIS San Francisco Field Office. (Zack, Adrienne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 12/12 3:53 PM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 10 Stipulation Extending Deadline to respond.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 12/12 2:59 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response and [Proposed] Order filed by Merrick B. Garland, USCIS San Francisco Field Office. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/12 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 10/12 1:07 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using correct event "Summons Returned Executed as to USA" Re:8 Certificate of Service filed by Alexander Peralta Campos, Mariana Laurian Calderon (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
8 8 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 10/11 10:37 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariana Laurian Calderon, Alexander Peralta Campos re7 Summons Issued as to USA (Sprouls, Frank)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 10/06 1:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Thu 10/05 7:30 AM
Proposed Summons. (Sprouls, Frank)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 10/05 7:24 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariana Laurian Calderon, Alexander Peralta Campos re1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, (Sprouls, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
4 4 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Tue 10/03 10:49 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 10/03 8:30 AM
Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 10/03 12:55 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101] Re:2 Certificate of Service re 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, and Summons filed by Alexander Peralta Campos, Mariana Laurian Calderon. No Proposed Summons was e-filed by counsel and No Summons has been issued. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
2 2 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 10/02 9:28 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariana Laurian Calderon, Alexander Peralta Campos re1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, and Summons (Sprouls, Frank)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Wed 09/13 4:46 PM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus as provided by 28 USC 1361 (Payment Tracking ID ACANDC-18620149) (). Filed byAlexander PERALTA CAMPOS, Mariana LAURIAN CALDERON.(Sprouls, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A through D,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet