California Northern District Court
Judge:Lisa J Cisneros
Case #: 3:23-cv-04718
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Oct 06, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 1:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Attorney General U.S. Department of Justice
Washington, DC 20530
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Plaintiff
SEYEDEHSHIMA SAFAEI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
SAMAN TEIMOURI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 05, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/05 8:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SEYEDEHSHIMA SAFAEI, SAMAN TEIMOURI (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 10/02 8:43 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/16/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 09/14 12:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Merrick B. Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Thu 09/14 12:20 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/14 8:42 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 09/13 9:01 PM
Proposed Summons. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Wed 09/13 8:49 PM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Filing fee $402 receipt number BCANDC-18641901). Filed bySAMAN TEIMOURI, SEYEDEHSHIMA SAFAEI.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit I-539 Receipt,
Att: 2 Exhibit SAMAN TEIMOURI I-589 INTERVIEW NOTICE,
Att: 3 Exhibit USCIS Case Status Online,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet