California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:23-cv-04678
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Mar 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:11 AM PDT
Defendant
Thomas J. Vilsack
Represented By
Rachael L. Westmoreland
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Kyla Snow
Doj-Civ
contact info
Patil Chetan
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Shalanda Young
Represented By
Rachael L. Westmoreland
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Kyla Snow
Doj-Civ
contact info
Patil Chetan
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Benitez
Represented By
Jodie Berger
Western Center On Law & Poverty
contact info
Fawn Jade Korr
Impact Fund
contact info
Meredith Dixon
Impact Fund
contact info
Robert Dexter Newman, Jr.
Western Center On Law And Poverty
contact info
Antionette Deshun Dozier
Western Center On Law And Poverty
contact info
Lindsay Polastri Nako
Impact Fund
contact info
Richard Rothschild
Western Center On Law & Poverty
contact info
Lori Rifkin
Rifkin Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Anika Okje Erdmann-Browning
Represented By
Jodie Berger
Western Center On Law & Poverty
contact info
Fawn Jade Korr
Impact Fund
contact info
Meredith Dixon
Impact Fund
contact info
Robert Dexter Newman, Jr.
Western Center On Law And Poverty
contact info
Antionette Deshun Dozier
Western Center On Law And Poverty
contact info
Lindsay Polastri Nako
Impact Fund
contact info
Richard Rothschild
Western Center On Law & Poverty
contact info
Lori Rifkin
Rifkin Law Office
contact info

GPO Sep 14 2023
ORDER DENYING EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITHOUT PREJUDICE; DEFERRING RULING ON APPLICATION FOR PROVISIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION; AND SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed September 14, 2023. (Tigar, Jon) (Filed on 9/14/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 15, 2024
59 59 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 03/15 8:57 AM
ORDER TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 58 Stipulation. (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
58 58 4 pgs motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 03/13 7:02 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re51 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,52 MOTION to Certify Class ,1 Complaint,46 Amended Complaint,48 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jacqueline Benitez, Anika Okje Erdmann-Browning. (Berger, Jodie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
57 57 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/12 4:26 PM
CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. The motion hearing set for 3/21/2024 is CONTINUED. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 17, 2024 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . , Set/Reset Deadlines as to48 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]