California Northern District Court
Judge:Richard Seeborg
Case #: 4:23-cv-04683
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Case in other court:Santa Clara County Superior Court, 23CV419699
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:12 AM PDT
Defendant
Katena Computing Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Lauren Trambley
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
John R Hardin
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Jacob Taber
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
David P. Chiappetta
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Coinmint, LLC
Represented By
Steven David Feldman
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth LLP
contact info
Jason de Bretteville
Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth LLP
contact info
Fletcher C. Alford
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Kevin Liu
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 10/03 9:07 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 10/03 1:12 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] to Katenas Motion to Compel Arbitration or Quash Service filed byCoinmint, LLC.(Alford, Fletcher)
Related: [-] 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action or, in the Alternative, to Quash Purported Service Under Rule 12(B)(5)
Att: 1 Declaration of Fletcher C. Alford,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Monday, October 02, 2023
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/02 1:12 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Katena Computing Technologies, Inc... (Chiappetta, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 09/29 10:18 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant filed a Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action or, in the Alternative, to Quash and a hearing has been scheduled for 11/9/2023 01:00 PM. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 636, the magistrate judge cannot decide this motion unless all parties consent to proceed before Judge Donna M. Ryu. Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/6/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Wed 09/27 2:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Katena Computing Technologies, Inc.'s Agent for Service of Process, Zijing "Michael" Gao on 9/21/23, filed by Coinmint, LLC. (Alford, Fletcher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 09/21 11:38 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant filed a Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action or, in the Alternative, to Quash and a hearing has been scheduled for 11/9/2023 01:00 PM. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 636, the magistrate judge cannot decide this motion unless all parties consent to proceed before Judge Donna M. Ryu. Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Affidavit Thu 09/21 8:44 AM
AFFIDAVIT re6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action or, in the Alternative, to Quash Purported Service Under Rule 12(B)(5) by Katena Computing Technologies, Inc.. (Chiappetta, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
6 6 motion Compel Tue 09/19 9:40 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action or, in the Alternative, to Quash Purported Service Under Rule 12(B)(5) filed by Katena Computing Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2023 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/3/2023. Replies due by 10/10/2023.(Chiappetta, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael Gao,
Att: 2 Declaration of John R. Hardin,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 09/13 9:50 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 09/13 9:58 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Re:3 Certificate of Service filed by Katena Computing Technologies, Inc. - As a reminder, use the correct office location and division when filing future electronic documentation. Case has been assigned to the Oakland office. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/13 7:31 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Katena Computing Technologies, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal,2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Chiappetta, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Katena Computing Technologies, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Chiappetta, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV419699. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18637037). Filed byKatena Computing Technologies, Inc..(Chiappetta, David) Modified Text on 9/13/2023 (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of David Chiappetta,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet