California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:23-cv-04719
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
Defendant
Facebook Payments , Inc.
Defendant
Google LLC
Defendant
Instagram LLC
Defendant
Meta Platforms Inc.
Defendant
Snap Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Hugh Blavin
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Victoria A. Degtyareva
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Siculus Inc.
Plaintiff
Alice Doe
Represented By
Hillary Mara Nappi
Hach Rose Schirripa & Cheverie LLP
contact info
James R Marsh
Marsh Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 28, 2025
19 19 29 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 02/28 11:57 AM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PERSONAL INJURY PLAINTIFFS' NON-PRIORITY CLAIMS (COUNTS 5, 12, 14, 1618); AND GRANTING SNAP INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 12 AND 14 ASSERTED IN PLAINTIFFS D.H., K.S., AND ALICE DOE'S AMENDED SHORT-FORM COMPLAINTS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 14 Motion to Dismiss. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
18 18 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Thu 02/15 5:59 PM
REPLY Related [+] Defendant Snap Inc.s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Counts 12 and 14 Asserted in Plaintiffs D.H., K.S., and Alice Does Amended Short Form Complaints filed bySnap Inc.. (Blavin, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Snap Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Counts 12 and 14 Asserted in Plaintiffs D.H., K.S., and Alice Doe's Amended Short Form Complaints
Monday, February 05, 2024
17 17 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 02/05 6:51 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byAlice Doe. (Nappi, Hillary)
Related: [-] 14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Snap Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Counts 12 and 14 Asserted in Plaintiffs D.H., K.S., and Alice Doe's Amended Short Form Complaints
16 16 misc Transcript Mon 02/05 10:16 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/26/2024, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stephen W. Franklin, telephone number (561)313-8439. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2024. (Franklin, Stephen)
Related: [-] (566 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order, (567 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order, (572 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order, (571 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order
Friday, January 26, 2024
15 15 minutes Discovery Hearing Fri 01/26 3:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Discovery Hearing held on 1/25/2024. Total Time in Court: 3h 24m. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Ayers, Lexi Hazam, Previn Warren, Emily Jeffcott, Thomas Huynh. Defendant Attorney: (Meta) Ashley Simonsen, Isaac Chaput, (Snap) Jonathan Blavin, (TikTok) Geoffrey Drake, Andrea Pierson, Amy Fiterman, (YouTube) Matt Donohue. (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2024)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
14 14 motion Dismiss Fri 01/12 4:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Snap Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Counts 12 and 14 Asserted in Plaintiffs D.H., K.S., and Alice Doe's Amended Short Form Complaints filed by Snap Inc.. Responses due by 1/26/2024. Replies due by 2/2/2024. (Blavin, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
13 13 6 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 01/09 4:46 PM
Order by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 12 Stipulation Re: 3 MOTION for Protective Order. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
12 12 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 01/08 7:43 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re3 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Alice Doe. (Nappi, Hillary)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/08 7:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Mara Nappi (Nappi, Hillary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/02 9:17 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ADDENDUM against All Defendants. Filed by Alice Doe. (Marsh, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
9 9 misc Transcript Wed 12/20 12:04 PM
Transcript of Proceedings (corrected to change date on title page) held on 12/14/2023, before Judge Peter H. Kang. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2024. (rre, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (486 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order
8 8 misc Transcript Wed 12/20 11:43 AM
***PLEASE DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NUMBER 511 FOR CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT. Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/14/2023, before Magistrate Judge Peter H. Kang. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2024. (rre, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/20/2023 (knm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (486 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
7 7 minutes Discovery Hearing Fri 12/15 10:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Discovery Hearing held on 12/14/2023. Fact and Expert Discovery Cut-Off Meeting: Parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding dates for fact discovery and expert discovery cut-off. This meeting must take place by January 19, 2024. Discovery Plan Proposal: A proposal for the discovery plan is due by January 19, 2024. Protective Order Briefing: Withdrawal of all briefing on the Protective Order appeal is due by December 18, 2023. Refiling of Protective Order briefing is due by December 18, 2023. No new arguments are permitted in the refiled Protective Order briefing. Defendants are allotted one page, single-spaced, to respond to State Plaintiffs' arguments on the Protective Order, due by December 18, 2023. State Plaintiffs are allotted a half-page, single-spaced, for their proposed carve-out on the Protective Order, due by December 18, 2023. Electronic Stored Information (ESI) Conference: Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding ESI, with their ESI vendors present, by December 29, 2023, to narrow currently pending ESI issues. ESI Proposed Language Chart: The ESI proposed language chart is due by January 12, 2024. Written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 1:11pm-2:31pm (2hr 20m). Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Seeger, Christopher Ayers, Lexi Hazam, Previn Warren, Bianca Miyata, Barney Eskandari, Megan O'Neill, Christian Lewis. Defendant Attorney: Ashley Simonsen, Greg Halperin, Isaac Chaput, Jonathan Blavin, Andrea Pierson, Christopher Chiou, Andrew Kramer, Rose Ehler, Geoffrey Drake, David Mattern, Brian Ercole, Stephanie Schuster, Laura Lopez, Paul Schmidt. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2023)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 10/10 8:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Google LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Inc., Siculus Inc., Snap Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 07, 2023
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Sat 10/07 11:20 AM
Proposed Summons. (Marsh, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/14 8:48 AM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Protective Order Thu 09/14 12:26 AM
MOTION for Protective Order filed by Alice Doe. Responses due by 9/28/2023. Replies due by 10/5/2023.(Marsh, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration James R. Marsh,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 09/14 11:20 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety in ONE summons, listing out the defendants in an attachment page. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by Alice Doe. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/14 12:01 AM
Proposed Summons.(Marsh, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/13 11:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18641965.). Filed byAlice Doe.(Marsh, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Create Case Association Thu 09/14 10:20 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 4:22-md-03047-YGR. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Thu 09/14 10:35 AM
DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 3047, Doe v. Meta et al, Opened in California Northern District as 23-cv-04719-YGR cc: JPMDL (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]