California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 5:23-cv-04681
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Oct 25, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:12 AM PDT
Defendant
SanDisk, LLC
Represented By
Joseph Louis Kish
Segal Mccambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Western Digital Corporation
Represented By
Joseph Louis Kish
Segal Mccambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Western Digital Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Louis Kish
Segal Mccambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathan Jackson
Represented By
Stephen R. Basser
Barrack, Rodos & Bacine
contact info
Samuel M. Ward
Barrack Rodos & Bacine
contact info
John G. Emerson
Emerson Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/19 2:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathan Jackson. SanDisk, LLC served on 9/15/2023, answer due 10/6/2023. (Ward, Samuel)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/19 2:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathan Jackson. Western Digital Corporation served on 9/15/2023, answer due 10/6/2023. (Ward, Samuel)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/19 2:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathan Jackson. Western Digital Technologies, Inc. served on 9/15/2023, answer due 10/6/2023. (Ward, Samuel)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/19 4:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Louis Kish (Kish, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
8 8 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 09/14 9:16 AM
Corrected Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 09/13 1:19 PM
***INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED, SEE DOCKET ENTRY 8 .*** Corrected Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/14/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 09/13 12:58 PM
***DISREGARD - DUPLICATE ENTRY*** Summons Issued as to SanDisk, LLC, Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/13/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 09/13 11:47 AM
Summons Issued as to SanDisk, LLC, Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies, Inc.. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 09/13 11:29 AM
***DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET ENTRY 8 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT*** Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2023 11:24 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/13/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/14/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/13 11:19 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Basser, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies, Inc., SanDisk, LLC (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18636432). Filed by Nathan Jackson.(Basser, Stephen) Modified on 9/13/2023 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/13/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet