California Northern District Court
Judge:Joseph C Spero
Case #: 4:23-cv-04721
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Case in other court:Alameda County Superior Court, 23CV040495
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By
Soheyl Tahsildoost
Theta Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Mehgan Gallagher
Theta Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Janet Leung
Represented By
Kevin Y. Jacobson
Quill & Arrow LLP
contact info
Luis A Serrano
Quill & Arrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ken Leung
Represented By
Kevin Y. Jacobson
Quill & Arrow LLP
contact info
Luis A Serrano
Quill & Arrow LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 14, 2023
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz North America Corporation, Other Affiliate Daimler International Nederland B.V., Other Affiliate Mercedes-Benz Group for Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV040495. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18642059). Filed byMercedes-Benz USA LLC.(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-KBB Value,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet