California Northern District Court
Judge:Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:23-cv-04721
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024
Case in other court:Alameda County Superior Court, 23CV040495
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By
Soheyl Tahsildoost
Theta Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Mehgan Gallagher
Theta Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Janet Leung
Represented By
Luis A Serrano
Quill & Arrow LLP
contact info
Kevin Y. Jacobson
Quill & Arrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ken Leung
Represented By
Luis A Serrano
Quill & Arrow LLP
contact info
Kevin Y. Jacobson
Quill & Arrow LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 15 2024
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/15/2024. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 02, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 05/02 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Y. Jacobson (Jacobson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/15 9:29 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/15/2024. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
17 17 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 04/12 2:49 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by Janet Leung, Ken Leung.(Serrano, Luis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation for Order of Dismissal
Friday, February 16, 2024
16 16 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Fri 02/16 3:12 PM
Minute Entry for ZOOM proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/16/2024. Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 4/17/2024 by 3:00 PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Total Time: 3 M (2:13-2:16). Plaintiff Attorney: Luis Serrano. Defendant Attorney: Kevin Zipser. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2024)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 12/11 9:12 AM
Order. Signed 12/11/2023 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 14 Stipulation to Continue December 15, 2023 Initial Case Management Conference.(klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
oth_evt ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/11 9:13 AM
See Order15 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. This date will be vacated if the stipulated dismissal is filed before this date. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
14 14 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 12/08 7:37 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 12 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing.,,, to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Gallagher, Mehgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mehgan Gallagher,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
13 13 misc Joint Case Management Statement Fri 12/08 4:56 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Janet Leung, Ken Leung. (Serrano, Luis)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Mon 12/04 3:44 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
11 11 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mon 11/27 10:57 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/07 2:38 PM
NOTICE by Janet Leung, Ken Leung JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Jacobson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 10/18 5:46 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ken Leung.. (Jacobson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 10/06 1:02 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 10/04 12:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/18/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 09/22 9:38 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/6/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/21 11:41 AM
ANSWER to Complaint byMercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/15 9:12 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/14 8:42 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 09/14 6:45 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz North America Corporation, Other Affiliate Daimler International Nederland B.V., Other Affiliate Mercedes-Benz Group for Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 09/14 6:38 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV040495. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18642059). Filed byMercedes-Benz USA LLC.(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-KBB Value,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet