California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Referred: Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 3:23-cv-04724
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Nima Golsharifi
Represented By
Christopher Charles Cooke
Murphy Cooke LLP
contact info
Patrick Thomas Murphy
Murphy Cooke LLP
contact info
Defendant
NDB, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Charles Cooke
Murphy Cooke LLP
contact info
Patrick Thomas Murphy
Murphy Cooke LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
44 Montgomery Street Suite 2800
San Francisco, CA 94104
Represented By
John Ky Han
Us Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Silvana Quintanilla
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
83 83 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 05/06 8:41 AM
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED ECF 82 Administrative Motion to Report Settlement in Principle. The parties have an agreement in principle, subject to the authorization of the commission. The Plaintiff is traveling internationally. Plaintiff will sign the agreement. Counsel will file a notice of settlement or administrative motion within six weeks. The case is stayed until June 12, 2025. The parties are ORDERED to file status report regarding settlement on June 12, 2025. The remaining dates will be vacated once the settlement is affirmed. If the case does not settle, the discovery deadlines will be readjusted. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 5/6/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
82 82 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Fri 05/02 6:00 PM
Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Report Settlement in Principle, Request Adjournment of Deadlines, and Provide Court with Timeline for Obtaining Final Settlement Authorization filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 5/6/2025.(Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order and Stipulation
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
81 81 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Settlement Conference Tue 04/29 5:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement planning call held on 4/29/2025 via Zoom. Results: Parties reported they have reached a settlement in principle and will file a status report by 5/2/2025 as ordered by Judge Thompson. Parties are invited to contact Judge Ryu should the need for settlement assistance arise. Digital Recording Time: Not Recorded For Plaintiff: Ben Kuruvilla and Silvana Quintanilla For Defendants: Taher Kameli (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/29/2025)
Related: [-]