New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: Stacey D Adams
Case #: 2:23-cv-20376
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
BED BATH & BEYOND, INC. 401 (K) SAVINGS PLAN COMMITTEE
Represented By
JEREMY P. BLUMENFELD
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
LAURA CROSSEN
Represented By
JEREMY P. BLUMENFELD
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Notice Only
PHV MARC R EDELMAN
Notice Only
PHV CARL F. ENGSTROM
Notice Only
PHV CHRISTOPHER J. BORAN
Notice Only
PHV JENNIFER K LEE
Plaintiff
PAUL HARVEY
Represented By
ANDREW R. FRISCH
Morgan & Morgan, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
MERYL EICHENBAUM
Represented By
ANDREW R. FRISCH
Morgan & Morgan, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
ROXANNE KUZOWSKY
Represented By
ANDREW R. FRISCH
Morgan & Morgan, P.A.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
LELA LAPLANTE
Terminated: 01/02/2024
Represented By
ANDREW R. FRISCH
Morgan & Morgan, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
62 62 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Fri 05/09 2:57 PM
ORDER granting60 Motion for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 5/9/2025. (mj)
Related: [-]