New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:23-cv-08115
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause28:1291 Maritime
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Val Edmund Wamser
Nicoletti Hornig & Sweeney
contact info
John Anthony Vincent Nicoletti
Nicoletti Hornig & Sweeney
contact info
Plaintiff
Stoneline Group, LLC
Represented By
Matteo Bonuzzi
Montgomery Mccracken LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
50 50 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 05/01 4:08 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:46 MOTION for Reconsideration re;45 Memorandum & Opinion,, . . Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company..(Wamser, Val)
Related: [-]
49 49 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/01 3:09 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the jury trial in this case will begin on November 4, 2025. The Court will allocate three days for the trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by September 24, 2025 the parties must file a proposed Joint Pretrial Order, any motions in limine, and all other Required Pretrial Filings in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a Final Pretrial Conference on October 27, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 9/24/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Pretrial Order due by 9/24/2025. Ready for Trial by 11/4/2025. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/1/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
48 48 11 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/24 8:22 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:46 MOTION for Reconsideration re;45 Memorandum & Opinion,, . . Document filed by Stoneline Group, LLC..(Bonuzzi, Matteo)
Related: [-]