California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Case #: 5:23-cv-04727
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Case in other court:Santa Clara Superior Court, 23CV417726
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Google LLC
Represented By
Emilie Smith Petirs
Duane Morris
contact info
Brian Lee Johnsrud
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Talat Tehranchi
Represented By
David S. Ratner
Ratner Molineaux, LLP
contact info
Shelley A. Molineaux
Ratner Molineaux, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, June 21, 2024
20 20 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 06/21 2:51 PM
STIPULATION Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Talat Tehranchi. (Ratner, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 04/11 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by David S. Ratner (Ratner, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADR Wed 12/13 12:18 PM
ORDER granting 17 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 12/13/2023. (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR Wed 12/13 10:12 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Google LLC filed by Google LLC. (Johnsrud, Brian)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Thu 12/14 10:07 AM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (af, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 11/30 3:19 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 is VACATED. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 12/14/2024. Close of Fact Discovery due by 4/4/2025. Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/2/2025. Dispositive Motion due by 3/6/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2025 at 10:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 7/7/2025 at 09:30 AM. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2025, 7/8/2025, 7/9/2025, 7/11/2025 and 7/14/2025 at 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge P. Casey Pitts. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 11/30/2023. (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 11/30 9:19 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Google LLC. (Johnsrud, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
14 14 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mon 11/27 5:19 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ratner, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
13 13 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 11/22 7:06 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Johnsrud, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
12 12 order Protective Order Mon 10/30 6:30 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 10/30/2023. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 20 pgs motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 10/30 11:19 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Google LLC. (Johnsrud, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/20 12:13 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge P. Casey Pitts in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/20 11:52 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge P. Casey Pitts for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/20/2023.(bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 09/20 10:49 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/20 8:58 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google LLC.. (Johnsrud, Brian)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 17, 2023
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Sun 09/17 7:05 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
5 5 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 09/14 2:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google LLC (Johnsrud, Brian)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 09/14 11:44 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. Holding Company of XXVI Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. Holding Company of Google LLC for Google LLC. (Johnsrud, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/14 11:42 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 09/14 11:39 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Johnsrud, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 09/14 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV417726. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18643611). Filed byGoogle LLC.(Johnsrud, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
respoth Answer to Removal Complaint Sun 09/17 7:01 PM
Answer to Removal Complaint Exhibit D by Google LLC. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]