Arizona District Court
Judge:Susan M Brnovich
Case #: 2:23-cv-01919
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Jun 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:17 AM MST
Defendant
BMO Harris Bank NA
Represented By
Ashley V Cheff
Stinson Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Michael Anthony Vincent
Stinson Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Meloniece Gaskin
110 E Shire Ct.
San Tan Valley, AZ 85143

GPO May 03 2024
Order. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/3/24. (DXD)ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's EFAA and section 1981 claims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's breach of contract, conversion, and unjust enrichment claims are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion and Request for an Evidentiary Hearing (Doc. 18) is denied. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend her EFAA and section 1981 claims. If Plaintiff intends to file a second amended complaint, it must be filed no later than 20 days after the date of this

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/08 2:08 PM
MOTION for Relief from Judgment Rule 60(b) by Meloniece Gaskin.(DXD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint
Monday, June 24, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 06/24 1:07 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with prejudice. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/24/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
27 27 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Wed 06/05 10:47 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file with the Clerk of the Court and serve on opposing counsel a responsive memorandum to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc.25 ) no later than June 18, 2024. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/5/2024. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/04 2:42 PM
NOTICE re: Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by BMO Harris Bank NA . (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
25 25 motion Dismiss Case Mon 05/20 6:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by BMO Harris Bank NA.(Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/07 10:41 AM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMO Harris Bank NA filed by Meloniece Gaskin.(DXD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
23 23 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Hearing Fri 05/03 3:15 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's EFAA and section 1981 claims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's breach of contract, conversion, and unjust enrichment claims are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion and Request for an Evidentiary Hearing (Doc.18 ) is denied. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend her EFAA and section 1981 claims. If Plaintiff intends to file a second amended complaint, it must be filed no later than 20 days after the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/3/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
22 22 misc Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing Mon 11/13 12:33 PM
REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Meloniece Gaskin. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/26 9:34 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:18 MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Evidentiary Hearing filed by Meloniece Gaskin. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
20 20 respm Response to Motion Tue 10/24 11:38 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:18 MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Evidentiary Hearing filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 10/18 11:07 AM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's Emergency10 Motion to Release Money. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 10/18/2023. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
18 18 motion Hearing Tue 10/17 4:15 PM
MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Evidentiary Hearing by Meloniece Gaskin. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 10/10 11:43 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/04 11:44 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Meloniece Gaskin. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
15 15 service Service Executed Tue 10/03 9:54 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Meloniece Gaskin: Proof of Service re: Summons/ Complaint upon BMO Harris NA on 9/29/23. (DXD)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Response to Motion Mon 10/02 12:45 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:10 MOTION to Release Money filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/02 12:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMO Harris Bank NA identifying Corporate Parent BMO Financial Corp., Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Harris Bank NA. (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss Case Mon 10/02 12:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by BMO Harris Bank NA.(Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, September 21, 2023
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/21 2:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMO Harris Bank NA filed by Meloniece Gaskin.(DXD)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/18 10:31 AM
Emergency MOTION to Release Money by Meloniece Gaskin. (DXD)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 6:30 AM
Summons Issued as to BMO Harris Bank NA. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/15 4:24 PM
ORDER that the2 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore is granted. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/14/2023. (ESG)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 09/15 4:23 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on December 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/14/2023. (ESG)
Related: [-]
6 6 4 pgs order Order Fri 09/15 4:21 PM
ORDER this matter having recently come before this Court, the parties are advised of the following preliminary policies and procedures that will govern these proceedings and are ordered as follows. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. See attached Order for complete details . Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/14/2023. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
5 5 misc Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Thu 09/14 12:36 PM
NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc New Case Opened Thu 09/14 12:35 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV23-01919-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Submitted Thu 09/14 12:31 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Meloniece Gaskin. (BAS)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/14 12:30 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Meloniece Gaskin. (BAS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/14 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Meloniece Gaskin.(BAS)
Related: [-]