California Northern District Court
Judge:Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:23-cv-04729
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Oct 18, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Joseph R. Biden
Defendant
Merrick Garland
Defendant
Director, USCIS Ur Jaddou
Defendant
Secretary Alejandro N. Mayorkas
Defendant
Anthony J. Blinken
Defendant
Mike Hankey
Plaintiff
Harish Jitendriya Sawarkar
Represented By
Roujin Mozaffarimehr
Immicore Law, A Professional Law Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 10/18 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Harish Jitendriya Sawarkar (Mozaffarimehr, Roujin)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 10/18 8:57 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]Document filed in wrong case. [err401]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:8 Stipulation filed by Harish Jitendriya Sawarkar Document contains incorrect case name, and case number and judge's initials. The attached is not a stipulation as it is not signed by opposing counsel. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
8 8 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 10/17 3:10 PM
STIPULATION filed by Harish Jitendriya Sawarkar. (Mozaffarimehr, Roujin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 10/04 12:05 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/18/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 09/26 9:02 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:6 Certificate of Service filed by Harish Jitendriya Sawarkar. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
6 6 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 09/25 1:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harish Jitendriya Sawarkar (Mozaffarimehr, Roujin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 09/15 9:10 AM
Summons Issued as to Joseph R. Biden, Anthony J. Blinken, Merrick Garland, Mike Hankey, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro N. Mayorkas.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Fri 09/15 9:09 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/14 3:10 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/14 3:04 PM
Proposed Summons. (Mozaffarimehr, Roujin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/14 2:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Harish Jitendriya Sawarkar ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18644584.). Filed byHarish Jitendriya Sawarkar.(Mozaffarimehr, Roujin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit H-1B Approvals,
Att: 2 Exhibit Passport,
Att: 3 Exhibit Communications with Consulate,
Att: 4 Exhibit Congressional Inquiry,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet