Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:23-cv-04626
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Case in other court:New York Eastern, 1:23-cv-06177
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 9:35 AM EDT
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Thomas John Herten
Archer & Greiner P.C.
contact info
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
individually 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
The 3M Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
E I Dupont de Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
12321 Hatcherville Road
Baytown, TX 77521
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Thomas John Herten
Archer & Greiner P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc.
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Corporation
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Plaintiff
Willow Brooks Estates
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Nicholas H Mindicino
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/29 3:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by BASF Corporation.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, April 25, 2025
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/25 3:11 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List
Monday, July 08, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 07/08 4:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, The 3M Company, The 3M Company, 3M Company, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). List of cases for dismissal)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, September 14, 2023
10 10 misc MDL Member Case Opened Thu 09/14 2:49 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Eastern (associated as of 9/14/2023), 1:23-cv-06177, Willow Brooks Estates v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04626-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 09/14 2:44 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:23-cv-06177. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Thu 09/14 12:19 PM
CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-151), Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. (TLH) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Thu 09/14 11:46 AM
JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-151), Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation , the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (TLH) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (TLH) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
5 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on November 15, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerks Office.) Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By November 9, 2023 , the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: [LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf] Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Defendants' counsel is directed to ensure that Plaintiff is aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/24/2023. (RO) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
4 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (SR) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually), Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company) re1 Notice of Removal,2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet (Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Notice of Removal, by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually), Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company) (Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually), Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company) from Supreme Court, Richmond County, case number 151161/2023. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16997995) (Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/14/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - NY State Court Complaint