California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:23-cv-04731
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
a Delaware Limited Liability Company 1515 3rd Street
San Francisco, CA 94158
Represented By
Colton Parks
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Samuel Quinn Schleier
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Paul Augusto Alarcon
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
a Delaware Corporation 1515 3rd St.
San Francisco, CA 94158
Represented By
Colton Parks
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Samuel Quinn Schleier
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Paul Augusto Alarcon
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Worzalla
Represented By
Adam Brett Wolf
Peiffer Wolf Carr Kane & Conway, Aplc
contact info
Angela J. Nehmens
Estey & Bomberger, LLP
contact info
Rachel Beth Abrams
Peiffer Wolf Carr Kane Conway & Wise
contact info

GPO Oct 23 2023
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-md-3084-CRB. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 23, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/21 1:29 PM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (vclc4, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/18 11:53 AM
Letter Request for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Dencity Odeluga.(kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, February 21, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/21 11:45 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer. Associated cases: 3:23-md-03084-CRB, 3:23-cv-04731-CRB. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/19 3:16 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to24 Third Party Complaint filed by Dencity Odeluga. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
26 26 service Summons Issued Mon 12/30 8:01 AM
Summons Issued as to Third Party Defendant Dencity Odeluga. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
25 25 misc Proposed Summons Fri 12/27 2:22 PM
Proposed Summons. (Salcedo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
24 24 cmp Third Party Complaint Wed 12/18 3:32 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Dencity Odeluga against Uber Technologies, Inc.. Filed by Rasier-CA, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc..(Salcedo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/09 10:11 AM
Short-Form Complaint (with jury demand) against All Defendants. Filed by Heather Worzalla. (Abrams, Rachel) Modified on 4/9/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/24 10:37 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
utility MDL Member Case Tue 10/24 9:57 AM
MEMBER CASE MDL 3084:3:23-cv-04731-VC Worzalla v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al pursuant to Order Relating Cases (Docket 26 in 3:23-md-03084-CRB) cc: JPMDL (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Mon 10/23 7:47 PM
ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/23/2023. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Mon 10/23 2:09 PM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-md-3084-CRB. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 23, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
19 19 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 10/03 4:05 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND RASIER, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/03 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Colton Parks (Parks, Colton)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/03 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Quinn Schleier (Schleier, Samuel)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 10/03 11:21 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Alarcon, Paul) Modified on 10/3/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/03 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Augusto Alarcon (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
14 14 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 09/26 9:51 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Heather Worzalla re6 Summons Issued (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case Mon 09/25 2:42 PM
Notice of Related Actions Filed in MDL 3084 In re: Uber Technologies, Inc. Passenger Sexual Assault Litigation. (Rule 6.2(d) of the Rules of Procedure for the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation). (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 09/19 10:42 AM
REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2023 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, November 24, 2023, by no later than 12:00PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/19 9:46 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/19/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
10 10 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 09/19 9:02 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/19/2023. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Heather Worzalla (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
1 1 49 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18644754.). Filed byHeather Worzalla.(Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet