California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 4:23-cv-04728
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1442 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Jan 16, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Marisol A. Chalas
Represented By
Christopher Frederick Jeu
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose A Rodriguez, Jr.
2140 Boca Raton Street
Hayward, CA 94545


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, September 25, 2023
8 8 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Relate Case Mon 09/25 3:38 PM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting (10) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:23-cv-04525-SI.Associated Cases: 3:23-cv-04525-SI, 3:23-cv-04527-SI, 4:23-cv-04728-DMR(ec, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 09/22 8:36 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant has filed a Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and a hearing has been scheduled for 11/9/2023 1:00 PM. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 636, the magistrate judge cannot decide this motion unless all parties consent to proceed before Judge Donna M. Ryu. Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
6 6 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 09/21 12:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marisol A. Chalas re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss (Jeu, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 09/21 11:20 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marisol A. Chalas. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2023 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/5/2023. Replies due by 10/12/2023.(Jeu, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 15, 2023
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/15 9:17 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
3 3 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 09/14 2:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marisol A. Chalas re1 Notice of Removal (Jeu, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/14 1:01 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 09/14 12:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV041422. (). Filed byMarisol A. Chalas.(Jeu, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet