Gettysburg Rental and Outdoor Power Equipment Cent
Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Henry W Van Eck |
Case #: | 1:23-bk-02095 |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2023 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jun 05, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Gettysburg Rental and Outdoor Power Equipment Center, LLC
720 York Road
Gettysburg, PA 17325 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
US Courthouse 1501 N. 6th St
Harrisburg, PA 17102 |
Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 6:07 PM EDT |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
195 | 195
court
CSI - Hearing canceled (ADI)
Mon 05/12 1:18 PM
Proceeding Memo for hearing scheduled on: 05/20/2025 MATTER: Amended Motion to Distribute Proceeds from a Sale filed by Debtor163 APPEARANCES: NA DISPOSITION: Hearing on Amended Motion to Distribute Proceeds from a Sale canceled. Matter mooted by a new Amended Motion to Distribute Proceeds from a Sale filed on 5/2/2025. (Wilson, Tonia) |