California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 4:23-cv-04732
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:552 Right to Privacy Act
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Feb 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Cinemark USA, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Alan Swartzendruber
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Joshua David Lichtman
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Jacqueline Groves Baker
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen Marelich
Represented By
Michael A. Caddell
Caddell & Chapman
contact info
John B. Scofield, Jr
Caddell & Chapman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 14, 2023
4 4 Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 COMPLAINT against Cinemark USA, Inc..(Fee Paid $402 ACANDC-18645198) Filed byStephen Marelich.(Caddell, Michael) Modified on 9/14/2023 (bar, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Caddell, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stephen Marelich (Caddell, Michael)
Related: [-]