California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:23-cv-04737
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Nov 16, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Alissa L. Emmel
Defendant
Merrick Garland
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Defendant
Ismail Ramsey
Plaintiff
Tianyu Ni
Represented By
Dillon Colucci
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Morgan Judith Kutzner
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, December 06, 2024
12 12 appeal Receipt for Appeal Record Mon 12/09 3:07 PM
Receipt for Notice of Appeal/Docketing Fee (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/16 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tianyu Ni (Kutzner, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 11/14 3:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tianyu Ni. Alissa L. Emmel served on 9/28/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Kutzner, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 10/27 2:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tianyu Ni. Merrick Garland served on 9/28/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Kutzner, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/24 1:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tianyu Ni. Alejandro Mayorkas served on 9/28/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Kutzner, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 09/19 2:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tianyu Ni (Kutzner, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 17, 2023
6 6 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Sun 09/17 6:45 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Sun 09/17 6:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Alissa L. Emmel, Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ismail Ramsey, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/14 4:16 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/14 4:08 PM
Proposed Summons. (Kutzner, Morgan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/14 4:07 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Tianyu Ni . (Kutzner, Morgan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/14 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18645554.). Filed byTianyu Ni.(Kutzner, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G