California Northern District Court
Judge:Sallie Kim
Case #: 3:23-cv-04730
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Mar 04, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
County of Marin
Represented By
Jacy C. Dardine
Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Christy Stanley
Represented By
Jacy C. Dardine
Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Cameron Colson
115 Baltimore Avenue
Larkspur, CA 94939
Plaintiff
Ralph Garside
115 Baltimore Avenue
Larkspur, CA 94939

GPO Nov 07 2023
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/30/2023. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 11/7/2023. (sklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 04, 2024
24 24 order Judgment Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/04 4:49 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/4/2024. (bxl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
23 23 4 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 03/04 4:47 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 3/4/2024. (bxl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 02/29 4:06 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] Re:22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Dismissal with Prejudice re21 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Dismissal with Prejudice Proof of Service filed by Christy Stanley, County of Marin. Incorrect event used. [err101] Document not properly linked. [err102] Case Number is incorrect. Please ensure that the case number is correct on future filings. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
22 22 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Wed 02/28 2:32 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Dismissal with Prejudice re21 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Dismissal with Prejudice Proof of Service filed by County of Marin, Christy Stanley. Responses due by 3/4/2024. (Dardine, Jacy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
21 21 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 02/26 9:22 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Dismissal with Prejudice filed by County of Marin, Christy Stanley. Responses due by 3/1/2024. (Dardine, Jacy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Wed 02/07 12:20 PM
ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 2/7/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2024 continued to 4/15/2024 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2024. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (bxl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
19 19 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 01/08 4:35 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 3 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Complaint due by 2/12/2024. (bxl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 01/08 2:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held by Zoom before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Motion Hearing held on 1/8/2024 re 3 First MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by County of Marin. Zoom Recording Time: 9:52-9:59. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2024)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/06 12:36 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 2/12/2024. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
17 17 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Fri 12/22 7:33 PM
AMENDED Cause of Action filed by Cameron Colson, Ralph Garside.. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Wed 11/29 10:38 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 15 Motion to Continue. Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2024, Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (sklc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
15 15 motion Continue Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 11/28 3:04 PM
First MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference , First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continue Initial Case Mgmt Conference re3 First MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by County of Marin, Christy Stanley. Responses due by 12/4/2023.(Dardine, Jacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service
Monday, November 27, 2023
14 14 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mon 11/27 3:00 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by defendants County of Marin and Cristy Stanly (Dardine, Jacy)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
13 13 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 11/13 10:06 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+]. Cause of Action Response to Invalid Motion to Dismiss, filed by Cameron Colson, Ralph Garside. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 3 First MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 11/07 12:53 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/30/2023. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 11/7/2023. (sklc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/07 4:41 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to3 First MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement . Motion Hearing reset for 1/8/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
11 11 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 10/26 9:34 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Marin Proof of Service to Notice of Non-Opposition (Dardine, Jacy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
10 10 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Wed 10/25 8:16 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byCounty of Marin, Christy Stanley. (Dardine, Jacy)
Related: [-] 3 First MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement
Friday, October 06, 2023
9 9 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 10/06 8:59 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Marin re5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge,3 First MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement (Dardine, Jacy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 10/03 3:25 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Marin, Christy Stanley.. (Dardine, Jacy)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 10/03 2:51 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendant County of Marin shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/10/2023 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2023. (mkl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Dismiss Tue 10/03 10:57 AM
First MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by County of Marin and Christy Stanley. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 11/13/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Responses due by 10/17/2023. Replies due by 10/24/2023.(Dardine, Jacy) Modified on 10/3/2023 (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Consent to Magistrate - Re-filed at docket
Att: 5 ,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, October 02, 2023
8 8 misc Letter Tue 10/03 9:33 PM
Letter from Cameron Colson. (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 10/03 9:32 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cameron Colson. (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 9:31 PM
COMPLAINT and Request for Injunction against County of Marin. Filed byCameron Colson. Consent/Declination due by 10/16/2023.(ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibits,
Att: 4 Envelope
Thursday, September 14, 2023
2 2 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 09/14 5:13 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2023 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/14 5:03 PM
COMPLAINT against County of Marin, Christy Stanley (Filing fee $ 402; Receipt No. 311166018). Filed by Ralph Garside, Cameron Colson. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023.(slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Receipt