California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 3:23-cv-04738
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Nov 27, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Health GPT, Inc.
Represented By
Monty Agarwal
Vallejo Antolin Agarwal & Kanter LLP
contact info
Robert H. Sloss
Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP
contact info
Rachel Lena Chanin
Antolin Agarwal LLP
contact info
Defendant
Munjal Shah
Represented By
Monty Agarwal
Vallejo Antolin Agarwal & Kanter LLP
contact info
Robert H. Sloss
Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP
contact info
Rachel Lena Chanin
Antolin Agarwal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hippocratic AI, Inc.
Represented By
Timothy F Keegan
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Sharon R. Smith
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
25 25 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/29 8:52 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Rita F. Lin. Judge Trina L Thompson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
24 24 oth_evt Clerks Notice ADI Mon 11/27 2:35 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Rita F. Lin in the San Francisco Division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials RFL immediately after the case number. 2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED . However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. All pending motions Related [+] must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Lin by the moving party for a date consistent with the Court’s law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoffs remain unchanged. 5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for after March 4, 2024 , and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before March 4, 2024, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines ( eg. , motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice. 8. Each party is expected to review and become familiar with all applicable standing orders and scheduling notes. 9. On or before December 11, 2023 , the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address the following items in the following order: a. Date Filed : The date the case was filed; b. Parties : A list or description of each party; c. Claims : A summary of all claims, counter-claims, cross-claims, or third party claims; d. Facts : A brief chronology of the facts and a statement of the principal factual issues in dispute; e. Legal Issues : A brief statement, without extended legal argument, of the disputed points of law, including reference to specific statutes and decisions; f. Relief : A description of the relief sought and the damages claimed with an explanation as to how damages have been (or will be) computed; g. Discovery : The status of discovery, including any significant discovery management issues, as well as any limits or cutoff dates; h. Related Cases : The status, case name, and case number of any related cases or proceedings pending before another judge of this court, or before another court or administrative body; i. Procedural History : A procedural history of the case, including any previous motions that were decided or submitted, any ADR proceedings or settlement conferences that have been scheduled or concluded, any appellate proceedings that are pending or concluded, and any previous referral to a magistrate judge; j. Deadlines : A description of any other deadlines in place before reassignment, including those for ADR, dispositive motions, pretrial conferences, and trials; k. Any modification of deadlines : Any requested modification of these dates, and the reasons for the request; l. Consent to Magistrate : Whether the parties will consent to a magistrate judge for trial; and m. Emergency : Whether there exists an immediate need for a case management conference to be scheduled in the action, and why the parties believe such a need exists. 10. The Joint Case Management Statement will not constitute a motion to extend or modify dates. If emergency relief is needed to modify a deadline, and the deadline is not of the type that can be modified via stipulation of the parties without a court order, the requesting party or parties shall additionally file a motion or stipulation for such relief in compliance with Local Rule 6. 11. The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. Hearings and trials in any civil case assigned to a judge participating in the Pilot Project are eligible for video recording, upon request and with the consent of the parties and the presiding judge. Please see the [LINK:Northern Districts webpage about participation in the Pilot Project] and [LINK:General Order 65] for more information. IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 11/27/2023 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] gardless of whether they are presently scheduled for hearing
Friday, November 24, 2023
23 23 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 11/24 12:51 PM
STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Hippocratic AI, Inc.. (Smith, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
22 22 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Mon 11/13 2:32 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Health GPT, Inc., Munjal Shah. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Trina L Thompson. Responses due by 11/27/2023. Replies due by 12/4/2023.(Agarwal, Monty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, October 30, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/30 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Lena Chanin (Chanin, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Thu 10/12 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Monty Agarwal (Agarwal, Monty)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/02 11:08 AM
Order GRANTING 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy Keegan. Signed by Judge Trina L Thompson on 10/20/2023. (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 09/29 9:14 AM
CLERKS NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Trina L. Thompson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Thompson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2023 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 09/29 9:21 AM
Set/Reset Hearing re 18 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing.,,,,, Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/28 8:54 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 09/28/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 09/27 3:05 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/27 2:28 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hippocratic AI, Inc... (Smith, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/26 11:43 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hippocratic AI, Inc.. Service waived by Munjal Shah waiver sent on 9/22/2023, answer due 11/21/2023. (Smith, Sharon)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/26 11:36 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hippocratic AI, Inc.. Service waived by Health GPT, Inc. waiver sent on 9/22/2023, answer due 11/21/2023. (Smith, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 09/25 4:39 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/22 1:04 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18671477.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/22/2023 filed by Hippocratic AI, Inc.. (Keegan, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
10 10 service Summons Issued Thu 09/21 2:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Health GPT, Inc., Munjal Shah.(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
9 9 misc Proposed Summons Wed 09/20 11:26 AM
Proposed Summons. (Smith, Sharon)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Proposed Summons Wed 09/20 11:18 AM
Proposed Summons. (Smith, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 09/19 8:25 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Health GPT, Inc., Munjal Shah (Sloss, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/18 2:24 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/18 6:56 AM
DEFENDANTS HEALTHGPT, INC., d/b/a HIPPOCRATIC HEALTH, and MUNJAL SHAH'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byHealth GPT, Inc.. (Sloss, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 9:26 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report Thu 09/14 5:20 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Smith, Sharon)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 09/14 4:44 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Hippocratic AI, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corporation and No Publicly Held Corporation Owns 10% or More of its Stock, Other Affiliate No Interest to Report for Hippocratic AI, Inc.. (Smith, Sharon)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/14 4:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Health GPT, Inc., Munjal Shah ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18645605.). Filed byHippocratic AI, Inc..(Smith, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet