California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:23-cv-04740
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Rasier LLC
330 N. Brand Blvd Suite 700
Glendale, CA 91203
Defendant
Uber Technologies Inc.
Collins | Ford, LLP 21900 Burbank Blvd 3rd Floor
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Plaintiff
A.I.
Slater Slater Schulman LLP 8383 Wilshire Blvd 255 Beverly Hills
Beverly Hills, CA 90211
Represented By
Lauren Aliz Welling
Slater Slater Schulman LLP
contact info
Michael Wayne Carney
Slater Slater Schulman LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 26 2023
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-md-3084. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 26, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
GPO Nov 22 2023
ORDER granting motions for leave to proceed anonymously. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/22/2023. Associated Cases: See Order. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
21 21 6 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/08 4:11 PM
FIRST AMENDED SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants. Filed by A.I..(Welling, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/10 1:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by A.I.. (Welling, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
19 19 3 pgs order Order Wed 11/22 2:32 PM
ORDER granting motions for leave to proceed anonymously. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/22/2023. Associated Cases: See Order. (crblc4, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
18 18 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 11/03 11:40 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A.I.(Welling, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
17 17 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/31 10:02 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Mon 10/30 4:07 PM
ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/30/2023. Associated cases: 23-md-03084-CRB, 23-cv-04740-VC, 23-cv-05524-VC. (crblc4, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
15 15 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases ~Util - Create Case Relationship Thu 10/26 8:59 AM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-md-3084. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 26, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/25 9:14 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 10/25/2023.(bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Thursday, September 14, 2023
3 3 motion Protective Order Thu 09/14 4:46 PM
MOTION for Protective Order filed by A.I.. Responses due by 9/28/2023. Replies due by 10/5/2023.(Welling, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/14 4:44 PM
Proposed Summons.(Welling, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 50 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/14 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18645771.). Filed byA.I..(Welling, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet